This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 13:04:31 (UTC).

Lighting Science Group Corp. v. General Electric Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 Lighting Science Group Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against General Electric Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00806

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lighting Science Group Corp.

Defendants

General Electric Company

Current Lighting Solutions, LLC

Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC d/b/a GE Lighting, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Colin Mayo

John G. Day

Christopher S. Stewart

Defendant Attorneys

Alexandra M. Joyce

Michael P. Kelly

Daniel M. Silver

Karon N. Fowler

 

Court Documents

#49

48 #1

Exhibits A-C

#48

45 #1

Exhibit A-B

#45

44 #1

Exhibit A

#44

#7

#6

5 #1

Exhibit 1-10

#5

#4

#3

1 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#1

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #48 Joint STIPULATION of Stay of Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1659 -- Case Stayed. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/1/19. (ntl) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Official Transcript of Motion to Transfer Hearing held on July 22, 2019 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/28/2019.(bpg) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Joint STIPULATION of Stay of Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1659 by Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, Current Lighting Solutions, LLC, General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORAL ORDER: For the reasons stated in court today, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #17 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York filed by Current Lighting Solutions, LLC, General Electric Company, Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/22/19. (ntl) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Oral Argument held on 7/22/2019. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Docket(#46) ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear oral argument on the motion to transfer on July 22, 2019 beginning at 2:00 p.m. Each side will be allocated up to 30 minutes to present its argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/17/19. (ntl) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) REDACTED VERSION of #40 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Lighting Science Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) DECLARATION re #43 Reply Brief (Declaration of Sheryl H. Love) by Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, Current Lighting Solutions, LLC, General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) REPLY BRIEF re #17 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York filed by Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, Current Lighting Solutions, LLC, General Electric Company. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Karon N. Fowler for Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, for Current Lighting Solutions, LLC, for General Electric Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lighting Science Group Corp.. General Electric Company served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting D.I. #1 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/2/2019. (ddp) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC on 5/2/2019; General Electric Company on 5/2/2019. (nmg) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketRemark: Exit Copies to Duty Judge (LPS) (ddp) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint, by Lighting Science Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10)(ddp) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (ddp) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,095,053 ;7,098,483 ;7,528,421 ;8,506,118 ;8,674,608. (ddp) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, General Electric Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 031734.) - filed by Lighting Science Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddp) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to File Complaint and Related Documents Under Seal - filed by Lighting Science Group Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ddp) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less