This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 11:13:18 (UTC).

Lighting Science Group Corp. et al v. Leedarson Lighting Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Lighting Science Group Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Leedarson Lighting Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark H. Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01949

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Global Value Lighting, LLC

Lighting Science Group Corp.

Defendants

Leedarson Lighting Co., Ltd.

Leedarson America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph John Gleason

Attorney at Gleason Law LLC

Suite 14084, 780 Morosgo Drive

Atlanta, GA 30324

Joel P. Stonedale

Attorney at Noroozi PC

Suite 2170, 11601 Wiltshire Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Michael Joseph Powell

Attorney at Powell IP Law, LLC

Suite 130, 10 Glenlake Pkwy.

Atlanta, GA 30328

Bradley W. Caldwell

Attorney at Caldwell Cassady Curry PC

Suite 1000, 2101 Cedar Springs Road

Dallas, TX 75201

John Austin Curry

Attorney at Caldwell Cassady Curry PC

Suite 1000, 2101 Cedar Springs Road

Dallas, TX 75201

Kayvan Noroozi

Attorney at Noroozi PC

Suite 2170, 11601 Wiltshire Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew N. Bathon

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson-DC

1330 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-1795

John Caracappa

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson-DC

1330 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-1795

Chien-Ting Kuo

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson-DC

1330 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-1795

Jarred Alexander Klorfein

Attorney at Caplan Cobb LLP

Suite 2750, 75 Fourteenth Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Michael A. Caplan

Attorney at Caplan Cobb LLP

Suite 2750, 75 Fourteenth Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Jarred Alexander Klorfein on behalf of Leedarson America, Inc., Leedarson Lighting Co., Ltd. (Klorfein, Jarred) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to Leedarson America, Inc. (bnw) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Global Value Lighting, LLC, Lighting Science Group Corp. (Gleason, Joseph) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#4

Clerks Notation re #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by MHC. (lwb) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 5/1/19. (bnw) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#2

(#2) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (bdb) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

1 #6

AO-120 Form

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 Redacted US 8,674,608 Claim Chart

1 #3

Exhibit 3 US 8,674,608

1 #2

Exhibit 2 Redacted US 7,528,421 Claim Chart

1 #1

Exhibit 1 US 7,528,421

#1

(#7) SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Confidnetial Versions of Exhibits to Complaint by Global Value Lighting, LLC, Lighting Science Group Corp. re #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - '421 Claim Chart (Confidential), #2 Exhibit 4 - '608 Claim Chart (Confidential))(Gleason, Joseph) Modified on 5/17/2019 to remove "provisionally" per #9 Order. (cmd) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Caracappa by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on June 24, 2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of John Caracappa Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8737580). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney John Caracappa added appearing on behalf of Leedarson America, Inc., Leedarson Lighting Co., Ltd. (pmb) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew N. Bathon by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on June 19, 2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Chien-Ting Kuo by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on June 19, 2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Chien-Ting Kuo Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8726930). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Michael A. Caplan added appearing on behalf of Leedarson America, Inc. (jkm) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew N. Bathon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8724834). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Michael A. Caplan added appearing on behalf of Leedarson America, Inc. (jkm) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) APPLICATION for Admission of John Caracappa Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8737580). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Leedarson America, Inc., Leedarson Lighting Co., Ltd.. (Caplan, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) APPLICATION for Admission of Chien-Ting Kuo Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8726930). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Leedarson America, Inc., Leedarson Lighting Co., Ltd.. (Caplan, Michael) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew N. Bathon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8724834). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Leedarson America, Inc., Leedarson Lighting Co., Ltd.. (Caplan, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Jarred Alexander Klorfein on behalf of Leedarson America, Inc., Leedarson Lighting Co., Ltd. (Klorfein, Jarred) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 5/17/2019. (cmd) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #7 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Global Value Lighting, LLC, Lighting Science Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gleason, Joseph) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Confidnetial Versions of Exhibits to Complaint by Global Value Lighting, LLC, Lighting Science Group Corp. re #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - '421 Claim Chart (Confidential), #2 Exhibit 4 - '608 Claim Chart (Confidential))(Gleason, Joseph) Modified on 5/17/2019 to remove "provisionally" per #9 Order. (cmd) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to Leedarson America, Inc. (bnw) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by MHC. (lwb) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Global Value Lighting, LLC, Lighting Science Group Corp. (Gleason, Joseph) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Value Lighting, LLC, Lighting Science Group Corp. by Global Value Lighting, LLC, Lighting Science Group Corp..(Gleason, Joseph) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 5/1/19. (bnw) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (bdb) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT with Jury Demand filed by Lighting Science Group Corp., Global Value Lighting, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8628880) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 US 7,528,421, #2 Exhibit 2 Redacted US 7,528,421 Claim Chart, #3 Exhibit 3 US 8,674,608, #4 Exhibit 4 Redacted US 8,674,608 Claim Chart, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 AO-120 Form)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less