This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2023 at 08:27:20 (UTC).

LightGuide, Inc. v. Amazon.Com, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On November 7, 2022, LightGuide, Inc. (“Plaintiff”), represented by Andrea L. Fair, Claire A. Henry, Garrett C. Parish, and Johnny Ward, Jr. of Ward, Smith & Hill PLLC and Andres C. Healy and Matthew R. Berry of Susman Godfrey LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services LLC (collectively “Defendants” or “Amazon”), seeking declaratory and injunctive relief for alleged infringement of the U.S. patents owned by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas with Judges Robert W. Schroeder, III and Roy S. Payne presiding. 

The plaintiff filed the complaint for alleged infringement of the U.S. Patent No. 7,515,981 (the “’981 Patent”), U.S. Patent No. 9,658,614 (the “’614 Patent”), and U.S. Patent No. 10,528,036 (the “’036 Patent”) (collectively, the “Asserted Patents”) owned by the plaintiff. 

In the complaint, the plaintiff claimed, “LightGuide is the owner of all rights, title, and interest in and to United States Patent No. 7,515,981 (the ‘’981 Patent’), United States Patent No. 9,658,614 (the ‘’614 Patent’), and United States Patent No. 10,528,036 (the ‘’036 Patent’) (collectively, the ‘Asserted Patents’).”

Plaintiff then alleged, “Amazon has willfully infringed and continues to willfully infringe at least claim 12 of the ’981 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271, either literally or through the doctrine of equivalents, by making, using, selling, or offering for sale in the United States, and/or importing into the United States, without authorization, systems and methods that practice at least claim 12 of the ’981 Patent, including by committing acts of infringement in this District. Amazon is liable for its infringement of the ’981 Patent pursuant to at least 35 U.S.C. § 271(a), (c), (d) and/or (f).”

Plaintiff further alleged that “Amazon makes, uses, sells, offers for sale, imports into the United States, and/or supplies or causes to be supplied from the United States, light guided operational guide systems, which infringe at least claim 12 of the ’981 patent.”

Plaintiff also alleged, “Amazon committed and is committing the foregoing infringing activities without license from LightGuide. Amazon’s acts of infringement have damaged and irreparably harmed LightGuide, as owner and assignee of the ’981 Patent.”

The plaintiff further alleged, “Amazon has had actual knowledge of the ’981 Patent since no later than September 2016. Amazon’s continued infringement, despite its knowledge that it infringes the ’981 Patent, is intentional, deliberate, willful, and characteristic of a pirate.”

Plaintiff then alleged that “Amazon has infringed and continues to infringe the ’981 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(f) by, for example, supplying or causing to be supplied in or from the United States all or a substantial portion of the components of the operational guide systems claimed in the ’981 Patent, where such components are uncombined in whole or in part, in such manner as to actively induce the combination of such components outside of the United States.”

The plaintiff also alleged that “Amazon is liable for infringement pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271(c) and/or (d), because with knowledge and intent to infringe the ’981 Patent, Amazon has both actively induced any such alleged third parties to directly infringe the ’981 Patent.”

Similar allegations have been made by the plaintiff with respect to the other Asserted Patents.

Plaintiff presented three claims for relief, each for the alleged infringement of the Asserted Patents.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested a judgment for declaratory and injunctive relief enjoining the defendants from using the Asserted Patents. The plaintiffs also requested an award for reasonable royalty damages and/or lost profits along with treble damages and supplementary damages. 

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00433

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LightGuide, Inc.

Defendants

Amazon.Com, Inc.,

Amazon.com Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andres C Healy

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

401 Union Street, Ste 3000

Seattle, WA 98101

Garrett C. Parish

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

Po Box 1231

Longview, TX 75606

John Edward Schiltz

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Seattle

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3800

Seattle, WA 98101

Johnny Ward, Jr

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Matthew R Berry

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

401 Union Street, Suite 3000

Seattle, WA 98101

Andrea Leigh Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Claire Abernathy Henry

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Defendant Attorney

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, PC

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.Com, Inc.,, Amazon.com Services LLC.( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#14

(#14) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.Com, Inc.,, Amazon.com Services LLC.( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#13

(#13) ***FILED IN ERROR***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.Com, Inc.,, Amazon.com Services LLC.( Dacus, Deron) Modified on 11/15/2022 (ch, ). (Entered: 11/15/2022)

12 #1

Executed Summons - Amazon.com Services LLC

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Edward Schiltz on behalf of LightGuide, Inc. (Schiltz, John) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew R Berry on behalf of LightGuide, Inc. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andres C Healy on behalf of LightGuide, Inc. (Healy, Andres) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

5 #1

Summons(es)

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LightGuide, Inc. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LightGuide, Inc.. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit C - '036 Patent

1 #3

Exhibit B - '614 Patent

1 #2

Exhibit A - '981 Patent

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com Services LLC to 1/13/2023; Amazon.Com, Inc., to 1/13/2023. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.Com, Inc.,, Amazon.com Services LLC.( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com Services LLC to 12/29/2022; Amazon.Com, Inc., to 12/29/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.Com, Inc.,, Amazon.com Services LLC.( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR. FIRST APPLICATION NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS Document # 13, Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ***FILED IN ERROR***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.Com, Inc.,, Amazon.com Services LLC.( Dacus, Deron) Modified on 11/15/2022 (ch, ). (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LightGuide, Inc.. Amazon.Com, Inc., served on 11/8/2022, answer due 11/29/2022; Amazon.com Services LLC served on 11/8/2022, answer due 11/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Executed Summons - Amazon.com Services LLC)(Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Edward Schiltz on behalf of LightGuide, Inc. (Schiltz, John) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew R Berry on behalf of LightGuide, Inc. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andres C Healy on behalf of LightGuide, Inc. (Healy, Andres) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Johnny Ward, Jr on behalf of LightGuide, Inc. (Ward, Johnny) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garrett C. Parish on behalf of LightGuide, Inc. (Parish, Garrett) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of LightGuide, Inc. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Amazon.Com, Inc.,, Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(klc, ) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (klc, ) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDistrict Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne added. (klc, ) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LightGuide, Inc. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LightGuide, Inc.. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Amazon.Com, Inc.,, Amazon.com Services LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9216000.), filed by LightGuide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - '981 Patent, #3 Exhibit B - '614 Patent, #4 Exhibit C - '036 Patent)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less