This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2021 at 08:24:04 (UTC).

Lightfoot v. Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA)

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Lightfoot filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America LINA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jodi W. Dishman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00718

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jodi W. Dishman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronnie Lightfoot

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James W Dunham, Jr

Attorney at James W Dunham Jr Attorney at Law

15 W Sixth St, Suite 2112

Tulsa, OK 74119

Defendant Attorneys

Kristina N Holmstrom

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart - PHOENIX

2415 E Camelback Road, Suite 800

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Lauren C Oldham

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart-OKLAHOMA CITY

621 N Robinson Ave, Suite 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the case before this Court is administratively closed until August 19, 2022. Unless a party moves to reopen or extend this proceeding before the August 19, 2022 date, this action shall be deemed dismissed with prejudice, and this Order shall become a final judgment that satisfies the separate- document requirement for purposes of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58(a). See Order for all details. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 08/18/2021. (nv) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#5

(#5) JOINT MOTION for Order to Administratively Close Case by Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA). (Holmstrom, Kristina) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Court extends the deadline for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to August 9, 2021. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 07/20/2021. (nv) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#3

(#3) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, [to Respond to Complaint] by Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA). (Holmstrom, Kristina) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA) . (Holmstrom, Kristina) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the case before this Court is administratively closed until August 19, 2022. Unless a party moves to reopen or extend this proceeding before the August 19, 2022 date, this action shall be deemed dismissed with prejudice, and this Order shall become a final judgment that satisfies the separate- document requirement for purposes of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58(a). See Order for all details. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 08/18/2021. (nv) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JOINT MOTION for Order to Administratively Close Case by Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA). (Holmstrom, Kristina) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Court extends the deadline for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to August 9, 2021. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 07/20/2021. (nv) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, [to Respond to Complaint] by Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA). (Holmstrom, Kristina) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA) . (Holmstrom, Kristina) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3723715. (Holmstrom, Kristina) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2021-1802 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Filed Documents, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter to OID and Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren C Oldham

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristina Novotny Holmstrom