This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2021 at 09:13:35 (UTC).

Lightfeather v. Beatrict State Developmental Center et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 Lightfeather filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Beatrict State Developmental Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pro Se Docket and Richard G. Kopf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00116

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Pro Se Docket

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Kopf

 

Party Details

Defendants

Trevor Davis

Millard Gustofsun

Administrator Dawn

Jake

Four Unknown Beatrice Police Officers

Libby

Anna

Unknown Medic

State Tropper Lead Investigator Howard

Bill

Pam Poll

Lee Wiener

Beatrict State Developmental Center

Officer Oliver

Becky

Alex

Hanna

Lead Social Worker Tammy

Devin Choat

Kevin Krugar

20 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#9

#10

#13

#5

#6

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORRESPONDENCE filed on behalf of Plaintiff Austin Edward Lightfeather.(MKR) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORRESPONDENCE on behalf of Plaintiff Austin Edward Lightfeather. (TCL) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORRESPONDENCE on behalf of Plaintiff Austin Edward Lightfeather. (MKR) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing #6 ), is granted. The filing fee shall be collected and remitted, as funds exist, in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). Until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid, the prisoner shall be obligated to pay, and the agency having custody of the prisoner shall forward to the clerk of the court, 20 percent of the preceding month's income in such months as the account exceeds $10.00. The clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order on the appropriate financial officer for Plaintiff's current institution. The next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party & plaintiff's institution) (LKO) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Austin Edward Lightfeather. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Austin Edward Lightfeather.(TCL) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Plaintiff's Motions... 1) I wish to motion a proceed of leave in forma pauperis, 2) I wish to request an AO 240 application, 3) I wish to request a motion of my filing fee for initial review..., (Filing #2 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion in a motion to proceed in forma pauperis that complies with 28 U.S.C. 1915. Plaintiff is directed to submit the $402.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 (Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: April 22, 2021: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party along with IFP form) (LRM) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Austin Edward Lightfeather.(LKO) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Administrator Dawn, Alex, Allen, Amber, Anna, Justin Ballord, Beatrict State Developmental Center, Becky, Bethany, Bill, Tommy Bower, Crystal Brown, Devin Choat, Crisis Director Jesse, Trevor Davis, Four Unknown Beatrice Police Officers, Scott Green, Millard Gustofsun, Hanna, Jake, Jennifer, Jeremy, Kelsy, Melissa King, Kevin Krugar, Lead Social Worker Tammy, Ashley Lefty, Libby, Matthew, Patrick Meritt, Officer Oliver, Timothy Parks, Pam Poll, Stacy, State Tropper Lead Investigator Howard, Tamara, Three Unknown Nebraska State Troppers, Unknown Medic, and Lee Wiener filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Austin Edward Lightfeather. (LKO) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Libby is a litigant

Latest cases where Jake Dog LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where , ALEX is a litigant

Latest cases where , BECKY is a litigant