This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 07:42:10 (UTC).

Light v. Viani et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Light filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Viani. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S. Kleeh and Michael John Aloi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Kleeh

Referral Judge

Michael John Aloi

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jeremy Colton Light

Charleston, WV 25309

Respondents

John Anderson

Salem Correctional Center

C. O. Milini

Captain D. Bailey

Katherine N. Hess

Angelo J. Viani

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Attachments

1 #1

*Restricted*

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Deficient Pleading and Intent to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 1983 form, #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

6 #1

1983 form

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 02/10/2020)

6 #2

Certified Mail Return Receipt

5 #1

*Restricted*

2 #2

Envelope

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00113. (jss) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE directing that this matter be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, Clarksburg Division, for additional proceedings; the plaintiff is directed to address any further information concerning this matter to that court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 2/14/2020. (cc: plaintiff) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#1

(#1) APPLICATION by Jeremy Colton Light to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (Attachment: #1 Average Resident Balance Statement) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 02/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Deficient Pleading and Intent to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 1983 form, #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00113. (jss) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE directing that this matter be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, Clarksburg Division, for additional proceedings; the plaintiff is directed to address any further information concerning this matter to that court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 2/14/2020. (cc: plaintiff) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION by Jeremy Colton Light to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (Attachment: #1 Average Resident Balance Statement) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.