This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/08/2020 at 07:24:39 (UTC).

Liggins v. City of Chicago et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Liggins filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Chicago. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary M. Rowland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04085

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary M. Rowland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Liggins

Defendants

Vincent Alonzo

Russell Egan

City of Chicago

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Thomas Hazinski

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen St., 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Arthur R. Loevy

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 North Aberdeen, 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Jonathan I. Loevy

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen, 3Rd Fl

Chicago, IL 60607

Russell R Ainsworth

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N Aberdeen Street, 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Defendant Attorneys

Jordan F Yurchich

Attorney at City Of Chicago, Department Of Law

30 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Jessica D Ziswa

Attorney at City Of Chicago, Federal Civil Rights Litigation

30 N. Lasalle St., Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60602

Scott A. Cohen

Attorney at City of Chicago Department of Law

30 N. Lasalle St., Ste. 900

Chicago, IL 60602

John A. Wall

Attorney at Klein, Thorpe & Jenkins, Ltd.

20 North Wacker Drive, Suite 1660

Chicago, IL 60606-2903

Anne Mary Skrodzki

Attorney at Klein, Thorpe, and Jenkins, Ltd.

20 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 1660

Chicago, IL 60606

Anthony George Becknek

Attorney at Klein, Thorpe & Jenkins Ltd.

20 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 1660

Chicago, IL 60606

Lance C. Malina

Attorney at Klein, Thorpe & Jenkins, Ltd.

20 North Wacker Drive, Suite 1660

Chicago, IL 60606-2903

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Vincent Alonzo, Russell Egan by Jessica D Ziswa (Ziswa, Jessica) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

16 #1

Notice of Filing

#16

(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by John A. Wall (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Wall, John) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

15 #1

Notice of Filing

#15

(#15) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Anne Mary Skrodzki (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Skrodzki, Anne) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

14 #1

Notice of Filing

#14

(#14) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Lance C. Malina (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Malina, Lance) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

13 #1

Notice of Filing

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Anthony George Becknek (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Becknek, Anthony) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Vincent Alonzo, Russell Egan by Jordan F Yurchich (Yurchich, Jordan) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendants' motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #10 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 9/25/20. The deadline of 9/23/20 for parties to file joint initial status report is re-set to 10/23/20. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION by Defendants Vincent Alonzo, Russell Egan for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Cohen, Scott) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Vincent Alonzo, Russell Egan by Scott A. Cohen (Cohen, Scott) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland:On or before 9/23/20, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Liggins by Arthur R. Loevy (Loevy, Arthur) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Liggins by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Liggins by Russell R Ainsworth (Ainsworth, Russell) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Liggins by John Thomas Hazinski (Hazinski, John) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Vincent Alonzo, Russell Egan by Jessica D Ziswa (Ziswa, Jessica) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by John A. Wall (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Wall, John) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Anne Mary Skrodzki (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Skrodzki, Anne) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Lance C. Malina (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Malina, Lance) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Anthony George Becknek (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Becknek, Anthony) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Vincent Alonzo, Russell Egan by Jordan F Yurchich (Yurchich, Jordan) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendants' motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #10 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 9/25/20. The deadline of 9/23/20 for parties to file joint initial status report is re-set to 10/23/20. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Defendants Vincent Alonzo, Russell Egan for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Cohen, Scott) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Vincent Alonzo, Russell Egan by Scott A. Cohen (Cohen, Scott) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland:On or before 9/23/20, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Vincent Alonzo, City of Chicago, Russell Egan. (ng, ) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Liggins by Arthur R. Loevy (Loevy, Arthur) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Liggins by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Liggins by Russell R Ainsworth (Ainsworth, Russell) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Liggins by John Thomas Hazinski (Hazinski, John) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, ) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice.(aee, ) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hazinski, John) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Michael Liggins; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17205574.(Hazinski, John) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Thomas Hazinski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Ainsworth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arthur R. Loevy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan I. Loevy