This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2022 at 07:57:02 (UTC).

Liforme Ltd. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A to the Complaint

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 Liforme Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A to the Complaint. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05575

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Liforme Ltd.

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A to the Complaint

Heathyoga

Ewedoos

Quanzhoushi wanxiangxinxikejiyouxiangongsi d/b/a FASCINATING DEAL

Jamie Sevenoaks

WannaToo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher M. Tom

Attorney at Thoits Law

400 Main Street, Suite 250

Los Altos, CA 94022

David Edward Hutchinson

Attorney at Thoits Law

1136 S. Delano Court West, Ste B201, 2068

Chicago, IL 60605

Defendant Attorneys

Jiyuan Zhang

Attorney at J. Zhang And Associates, P.c.

13620 38Th Avenue, Unit 11G

Flushing, NY 11354

Timothy Tiewei Wang

Attorney at Ni, Wang & Massand Pllc

8140 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75231

Daniel I. Konieczny

Attorney at Tabet DiVito & Rothstein, LLC

The Rookery Building, 209 South Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Zheng Gong

Attorney at ShinyRise PLLC

1 East Erie St., Suite 525-5203

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

#49

(#49) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the pleadings under Rule 15(a)(2) #47 is granted. The court finds that justice requires granting leave. Plaintiff has filed an amended Schedule A on the docket #48 . Defendants No. 42 DevonloskyDirect, No. 52, Global Diffusion Limited, No. 62 KUYOU Outdoor, and No. 73 WOWELL DIRECT terminated. (rao, ) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#48

(#48) AMENDED Third Amended Schedule A to the Complaint Instanter. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#47

(#47) MOTION by Plaintiff Liforme Ltd. to amend/correct Schedule A to the Complaint Instanter. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#46

(#46) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant WannaToo's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #42 is granted. Defendant WannaToo to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 1/31/2023. (rao, ) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#45

(#45) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The court has reviewed the Stipulation regarding asset restraint for defendant Fascinating Deal #41 . The Stipulation #41 is granted. (rao, ) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#44

(#44) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Plaintiff's motion to file an amended Schedule A #39 is granted. The court finds that justice requires granting leave under Rule 15(a)(2). No. 47 Elon's Shop, No. 117 invisation, No. 128 Aegean Flagship Store, No. 129 Boji Flagship Store, No. 130 Huateng Yegang Flagship Store, No. 131 Hukai Sports Outdoor Store, No. 132 Kazixi Sports Outdoor Flagship Store, No. 133 Yan Wenming Outdoor Store, and No. 134 Zhenshike Flagship Store terminated. Plaintiff has already filed an amended Schedule A on the docket #40 identifying the remaining defendants. (rao, ) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#42

(#42) MOTION by Defendant WannaToo for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 Unopposed (Gong, Zheng) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

#41

(#41) STIPULATION regarding asset restraint for Defendant Fascinating Deal. (Tom, Christopher) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#40

(#40) AMENDED Second Amended Schedule A to the Complaint Instanter. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

9 #4

Exhibit Ex. 2 to Attorney Declaration

9 #3

Exhibit Ex. 1 to Attorney Declaration

9 #1

Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application

6 #1

Supplement Schedule A to Copyright Claims AO 121 form

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Liforme Ltd. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Liforme Ltd. by David Edward Hutchinson (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the pleadings under Rule 15(a)(2) #47 is granted. The court finds that justice requires granting leave. Plaintiff has filed an amended Schedule A on the docket #48 . Defendants No. 42 DevonloskyDirect, No. 52, Global Diffusion Limited, No. 62 KUYOU Outdoor, and No. 73 WOWELL DIRECT terminated. (rao, ) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) AMENDED Third Amended Schedule A to the Complaint Instanter. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MOTION by Plaintiff Liforme Ltd. to amend/correct Schedule A to the Complaint Instanter. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant WannaToo's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #42 is granted. Defendant WannaToo to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 1/31/2023. (rao, ) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The court has reviewed the Stipulation regarding asset restraint for defendant Fascinating Deal #41 . The Stipulation #41 is granted. (rao, ) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Plaintiff's motion to file an amended Schedule A #39 is granted. The court finds that justice requires granting leave under Rule 15(a)(2). No. 47 Elon's Shop, No. 117 invisation, No. 128 Aegean Flagship Store, No. 129 Boji Flagship Store, No. 130 Huateng Yegang Flagship Store, No. 131 Hukai Sports Outdoor Store, No. 132 Kazixi Sports Outdoor Flagship Store, No. 133 Yan Wenming Outdoor Store, and No. 134 Zhenshike Flagship Store terminated. Plaintiff has already filed an amended Schedule A on the docket #40 identifying the remaining defendants. (rao, ) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant Ewedoos's unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint #38 is granted. Ewedoos to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 12/15/2022. (rao, ) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MOTION by Defendant WannaToo for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 Unopposed (Gong, Zheng) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) STIPULATION regarding asset restraint for Defendant Fascinating Deal. (Tom, Christopher) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) AMENDED Second Amended Schedule A to the Complaint Instanter. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLAIM by Liforme Ltd. regarding Patents. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Liforme Ltd. by Christopher M. Tom (Tom, Christopher) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Liforme Ltd. Ex 3 (Parts 1-16 of 16) of James Armitage Declaration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 3 (2 of 16) of James Armitage Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 3 (3 of 16) of James Armitage Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 (4 of 16) of James Armitage Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 (5 of 16) of James Armitage Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3 (6 of 16) of James Armitage Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ex. 3 (7 of 16) of James Armitage Declaration, #7 Exhibit Ex. 3 (8 of 16) of James Armitage Declaration, #8 Exhibit Ex. 3 (9 of 16) of James Armitage Declaration, #9 Exhibit Ex. 3 (10 of 16) of James Armitage Declaration, #10 Exhibit Ex. 3 (11 of 16) of James Armitage Declaration, #11 Exhibit Ex. 3 (12 of 16) of James Armitage Declaration, #12 Exhibit Ex. 3 (13 of 16) of James Armitage Declaration, #13 Exhibit Ex. 3 (14 of 16) of James Armitage Declaration, #14 Exhibit Ex. 3 (15 of 16) of James Armitage Declaration, #15 Exhibit Ex. 3 (16 of 16) of James Armitage Declaration)(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Liforme Ltd. for leave to file excess pages Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Entry of a TRO, including a Temporary Transfer of control over the Defendant Internet Stores, a Temporary Asset Restraint, An Order for Expedited Discovery, and Granting Permission to Effectuate Service of Process by E-mail and Electronic Publication, #2 Declaration Attorney Declaration (David E. Hutchinson) ISO TRO, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Attorney Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Attorney Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Attorney Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Attorney Declaration, #7 Exhibit Ex 5 to Attorney Declaration, #8 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Attorney Declaration, #9 Declaration Declaration of James Armitage (Client), #10 Exhibit Ex. 1 to James Armitage Declaration (Copyright Registrations), #11 Exhibit Ex. 2 to James Armitage Declaration (Patent Registrations))(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLAIM by Liforme Ltd. regarding Copyright. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Schedule A to Copyright Claims AO 121 form)(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Liforme Ltd. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Liforme Ltd. Schedule A to Complaint (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Liforme Ltd. by David Edward Hutchinson (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Liforme Ltd.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19932265. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Liforme Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit Ex.2 - Liforme Patent Registrations, #3 Supplement Provisionally Filed Under Seal - Schedule A Slip sheet)(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less