This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2020 at 12:05:18 (UTC).

Lifestyle Publications, LLC v. Harding

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Lifestyle Publications, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Harding. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth G. Gale and Daniel D. Crabtree. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02007

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenneth G. Gale

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Crabtree

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lifestyle Publications, LLC

Kingdom Holdings, LLC

Defendant

Randy Harding

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Erin M Naeger

Stinson Leonard Street, 1201 Walnut Street, Suite 2900

Kansas City, MO 64106

Alexis Gabrielson

Stinson Leonard Street, Llp - St. Louis, 7700 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63105

Carrie M. Francis

Stinson Leonard Street, Llp - Phoenix, 1850 North Central Avenue, Suite 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4584

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Ink Signed ECF Form of Attorney Alexis Gabrielson

#6

6 #1

Ink Signed ECF Form of Attorney Carrie Francis

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Alexis Gabrielson, and granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Carrie M. Francis as counsel for Lifestyle Publications, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 2/13/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for attorney Carrie M. Francis to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4708262.) by Plaintiff Lifestyle Publications, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Naeger, Erin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2019: #1 Ink Signed ECF Form of Attorney Carrie Francis) (gw). (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for attorney Alexis M. Gabrielson to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4708254.) by Plaintiff Lifestyle Publications, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Naeger, Erin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2019: #1 Ink Signed ECF Form of Attorney Alexis Gabrielson) (gw). (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Lifestyle Publications, LLC upon Randy Harding served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019 (Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lifestyle Publications, LLC . (Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Randy Harding. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Lifestyle Publications, LLC. (Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4675667.), filed by Lifestyle Publications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lifestyle Publications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexis Marie Gabrielson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin M Naeger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carrie Marie Francis