This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 17:38:57 (UTC).

Lifesavers of America Group LLC v. Lifesavers Inc

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 Lifesavers of America Group LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Lifesavers Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Bruce Howe Hendricks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02501

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce Howe Hendricks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lifesavers of America Group LLC doing business as Greenville CPR

Defendant

Lifesavers Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott F Talley

Attorney at Talley Law Firm PA

134 Oakland Avenue

Spartanburg, SC 29302

Shannon Metz Phillips

Attorney at Talley Law Firm PA

134 Oakland Avenue

Spartanburg, SC 29302

Defendant Attorneys

Kenneth B Wingate

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow

Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29211

Brandon Gottschall

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow PA

1515 Lady Street, Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

State Court Documents Summons and Complaint

1 #2

State Court Documents Answer

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

11 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order

#12

#13

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/13/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/14/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/18/2020, Discovery due by 5/15/2020, Motions due by 6/15/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 9/14/2020, Mediation Due by 5/15/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 9/30/19. (alew, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Lifesavers Inc, Lifesavers of America Group LLC. Refiled by clerk to correct event type.(alew, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Lifesavers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Gottschall, Brandon) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Lifesavers Inc.(Gottschall, Brandon) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 3/16/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 9/19/19. (alew, ) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/10/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/24/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/24/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/14/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/16/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/15/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/15/2020, Discovery due by 3/16/2020, Motions due by 4/15/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 7/14/2020, Mediation Due by 3/16/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 9/19/19. (alew, ) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lifesavers of America Group LLC.(Talley, Scott) Modified on 9/19/2019 to edit text (alew, ). (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPLY by Lifesavers of America Group LLC to Lifesavers Inc State Court Counterclaim . (Talley, Scott) Modified on 9/19/2019 to edit text (alew, ). (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lifesavers Inc.(alew, ) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-23-02574. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8652908), filed by Lifesavers Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #2 State Court Documents Answer)(alew, ) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott F Talley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shannon Metz Phillips