This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2021 at 07:54:28 (UTC).

Life Time, Inc. v. Journey Health and Fitness, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Life Time, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Journey Health and Fitness, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David T. Schultz and Patrick J. Schiltz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-00192

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Life Time, Inc.

Defendants

Jeff Jones

Journey Health and Fitness, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Molly E Nephew

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

225 South 6Th Street, Ste 1800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Patrick R Martin

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

225 South Sixth Street, Ste 1800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Caleena S Braig

Attorney at Moye White, LLP

1400 16Th Street, Suite 600

Denver, CO 80202

Stephanie Loughner

Attorney at Moye White, LLP

1400 16Th St., 6Th Fl

Denver, CO 80202

Taylor D. Sztainer

Attorney at Moss & Barnett, PA

150 S 5Th St Ste 1200

Mpls, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#16

#15

#11

#7

6 #1

Exhibit(s) A-C

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A-D

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER on #21 Stipulation to Stay. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 3/18/2021.(CLG) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #21 Stipulation. (Nephew, Molly) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION to Stay Deadlines and Action by Life Time, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Journey Health and Fitness, LLC and Jeff Jones. (Nephew, Molly) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 3/10/2021. (CLG) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Life Time, Inc..(Nephew, Molly) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Life Time, Inc.. (Nephew, Molly) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephanie Loughner for Jeff Jones and for Journey Health and Fitness, LLC; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Caleena S Braig for Jeff Jones and for Journey Health and Fitness, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/23/2021. (NAH) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Jeff Jones, Journey Health and Fitness, LLC.(Sztainer, Taylor) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #11 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Jeff Jones, Journey Health and Fitness, LLC.(Sztainer, Taylor) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Declaration of Jeff Jones in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Jeff Jones, Journey Health and Fitness, LLC.(Sztainer, Taylor) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Caleena S. Braig. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8516089 filed by Jeff Jones, Journey Health and Fitness, LLC. (Sztainer, Taylor) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephanie D. Loughner. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8516071 filed by Jeff Jones, Journey Health and Fitness, LLC. (Sztainer, Taylor) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Life Time, Inc.. Journey Health and Fitness, LLC served on 2/2/2021, answer due 2/23/2021. (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Life Time, Inc.. Jeff Jones served on 1/29/2021, answer due 2/19/2021. (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/29/2021.(TJB) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Jeff Jones, Journey Health and Fitness, LLC. (KDS) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-192 PJS/DTS. (KDS) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Life Time, Inc.. (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jeff Jones, Journey Health and Fitness, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8436952) filed by Life Time, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LTF CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY, INC., dba Life Time Fitness, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Molly E Nephew

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick R Martin