This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2022 at 08:15:10 (UTC).

Life Insurance Company of the Southwest v. Sant Anna

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 Life Insurance Company of the Southwest filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Sant Anna. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert N. Scola, Jr and Jonathan Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-20407

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Life Insurance Company of the Southwest

Defendant

Denice Sant Anna

Sunny Isles, FL 33160

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fred Conwell Marshall, II

Attorney at Hill Ward Henderson PA

101 E. Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

Brett Joseph Preston

Attorney at Hill Ward Henderson

101 E. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #6

Exhibit D

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Denice Sant Anna. (mee) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#4

(#4) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 2/11/2022. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest identifying Corporate Parent NLV Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent National Life Holding Company, Corporate Parent National Life Insurance Company for Life Insurance Company of the Southwest (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest. Denice Sant Anna served on 2/21/2022, response/answer due 3/14/2022. (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Supplement

#11

(#11) ORDER, denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/16/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Response Answer Due Deadline: Denice Sant Anna answer due 4/13/2022. Modified on 3/17/2022 (mee). Per d.e. #10 Order. (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER, denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/16/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appoint Counsel ( address updated ) by Denice Sant Anna. Responses due by 3/28/2022 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(mee). Added MOTION for Extension of Time on 3/15/2022 (mee). (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest. Denice Sant Anna served on 2/21/2022, response/answer due 3/14/2022. (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest identifying Corporate Parent NLV Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent National Life Holding Company, Corporate Parent National Life Insurance Company for Life Insurance Company of the Southwest (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (cqs) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 2/11/2022. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Denice Sant Anna. (mee) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Denice Sant Anna. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15385753, filed by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Preston, Brett) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less