This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/23/2022 at 00:28:43 (UTC).

Life Insurance Company of the Southwest v. Murphy

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 Life Insurance Company of the Southwest filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Murphy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Badalamenti and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00132

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Badalamenti

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Life Insurance Company of the Southwest

Defendant

Alisa Murphy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brett J. Preston

Attorney at Hill Ward Henderson, PA

101 E Kennedy Blvd - Ste 3700, Po Box 2231

Tampa, FL 33602-5195

Fred Conwell Marshall, II

Attorney at Hill Ward Henderson PA

101 E. Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Alisa Murphy (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19287077) filed by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Preston, Brett) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest identifying Corporate Parent National Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent NLV Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent National Life Holding Company for Life Insurance Company of the Southwest. (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest. (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Alisa Murphy. (SPB) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#6

(#6) CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/7/2022. (SPB) (SPB). (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Brett J. Preston on behalf of Life Insurance Company of the Southwest. Lead Counsel: Brett J. Preston. (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#11

(#11) JOINT STIPULATION and Motion for Entry of Final Judgment by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest, AND Alisa Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Final Judgment)(Preston, Brett) Modified on 3/10/2022, to edit event type, pursuant to LC/JA. (SPB). (Entered: 03/10/2022)

11 #1

Exhibit Proposed Final Judgment

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment as detailed in the attached order. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 3/30/2022. (JHA) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JUDGMENT ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (SPB) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment as detailed in the attached order. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 3/30/2022. (JHA) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT STIPULATION and Motion for Entry of Final Judgment by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest, AND Alisa Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Final Judgment)(Preston, Brett) Modified on 3/10/2022, to edit event type, pursuant to LC/JA. (SPB). (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Brett J. Preston on behalf of Life Insurance Company of the Southwest. Lead Counsel: Brett J. Preston. (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE to counsel Fred Conwell Marshall, II of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/7/2022. (SPB) (SPB). (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Alisa Murphy. (SPB) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest. (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:22-cv-0132-JLB-MRM. (SJB) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest identifying Corporate Parent National Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent NLV Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent National Life Holding Company for Life Insurance Company of the Southwest. (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Alisa Murphy (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19287077) filed by Life Insurance Company of the Southwest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Preston, Brett) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less