This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2019 at 07:20:12 (UTC).

Lienhard v. General Motors, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 Lienhard filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against General Motors, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jesse M. Furman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05593

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesse M. Furman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Virgil Lienhard

Defendant

General Motors, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brett A. Emison

Attorney at Langdon & Emison

911 Main Street, P.O. Box 220

Lexington, MO 64067

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. General Motors, LLC served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. Service was accepted by CSC Lawyers. Document filed by Virgil Lienhard. (Emison, Brett) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to General Motors, LLC. (sj) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

6905 #1

Exhibit 1

#6905

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter served on Affected Plaintiffs on June 28, 2019. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(Bloomer, Andrew) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#6890

(#7) MDL CONSOLIDATION ORDER: Pursuant to the June 12, 2014 Order of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML), In re: General Motors Ignition Switch Litigation, 14-MD-2543, has been assigned to this Court for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. 14-MD-2543, Docket No. 1. As this case, Lienhard v. General Motors LLC, 19-CV-5593, has been directly filed in this district and, based on the Court's review, appears to be within the scope of the multidistrict litigation, it is hereby ORDERED that it is transferred to 14-MD-2543 for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, subject to the process for objections set forth in Section II of Order No. 8. See 14-MD-2543, Docket No. 249, at 4-5. Counsel is advised to consult the docket in 14-MD-2543, including Order Nos. 1 and 25 (14-MD-2543, Docket Nos. 19 and 422, respectively), as well as the GM Ignition Switch MDL website (http://gmignitionmdl.com), for other pertinent information. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in the above-captioned cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/24/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:19-cv-05593-UA(ne) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to General Motors, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Virgil Lienhard. (Emison, Brett) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-MD-2543. Document filed by Virgil Lienhard.(Emison, Brett) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Emison, Brett) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against General Motors, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17088520)Document filed by Virgil Lienhard.(Emison, Brett) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter served on Affected Plaintiffs on June 28, 2019. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(Bloomer, Andrew) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MDL CONSOLIDATION ORDER: Pursuant to the June 12, 2014 Order of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML), In re: General Motors Ignition Switch Litigation, 14-MD-2543, has been assigned to this Court for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. 14-MD-2543, Docket No. 1. As this case, Lienhard v. General Motors LLC, 19-CV-5593, has been directly filed in this district and, based on the Court's review, appears to be within the scope of the multidistrict litigation, it is hereby ORDERED that it is transferred to 14-MD-2543 for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, subject to the process for objections set forth in Section II of Order No. 8. See 14-MD-2543, Docket No. 249, at 4-5. Counsel is advised to consult the docket in 14-MD-2543, including Order Nos. 1 and 25 (14-MD-2543, Docket Nos. 19 and 422, respectively), as well as the GM Ignition Switch MDL website (http://gmignitionmdl.com), for other pertinent information. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in the above-captioned cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/24/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:19-cv-05593-UA(ne) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. (ne) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. General Motors, LLC served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. Service was accepted by CSC Lawyers. Document filed by Virgil Lienhard. (Emison, Brett) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to General Motors, LLC. (sj) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 1:14md2543. (sj) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to General Motors, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Virgil Lienhard. (Emison, Brett) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-MD-2543. Document filed by Virgil Lienhard.(Emison, Brett) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Emison, Brett) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against General Motors, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17088520)Document filed by Virgil Lienhard.(Emison, Brett) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less