This case was last updated from PACER on 07/27/2019 at 07:07:57 (UTC).

LIEN v. OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 LIEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and HOPE T CANNON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01550

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

HOPE T CANNON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM K LIEN

Defendant

OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH A ZARZAUR, JR

Attorney at ZARZAUR LAW PA - PENSACOLA FL

11 E Romana St, Po Box 12305 [32591]

Pensacola, FL 32502

Defendant Attorney

ELIZABETH NICOLE PALMER

Attorney at WADE PALMER SHOEMAKER - PENSACOLA FL

14 N Palafox Street

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION to Accept Response to #6 Motion to Remand. Plaintiff's #9 Motion is accepted as timely filed. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/9/2019. (alb) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#6

(#6) First MOTION to Remand to State Court by KIM K LIEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 DEMAND, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2 COUNTEROFFER, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3 COUNTERDEMAND, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4 FULL AND FINAL OFFER, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5 MENDOZA ORDER) (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PALMER, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#10

(#10) Defendant, Owners Insurance Company's MOTION to Accept Response to #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court, by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PALMER, ELIZABETH) Modified on 7/8/2019 to clarify title of document (alb). (Entered: 07/08/2019)

6 #2

Exhibit EXHIBIT 2 COUNTEROFFER

6 #3

Exhibit EXHIBIT 3 COUNTERDEMAND

6 #5

Exhibit EXHIBIT 5 MENDOZA ORDER

6 #4

Exhibit EXHIBIT 4 FULL AND FINAL OFFER

6 #1

Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 DEMAND

#8

(#8) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL Re: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting : Discovery deadline is extended to 2/10/2020., The deadline for filing potentially dispositive motions as well as Daubert motions is 3/10/2020. Mediation to be completed by 3/9/2020. The mediator or parties shall file a report by 3/23/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/2/2019. (alb) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#7

(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (PALMER, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PALMER, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#4

(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/12/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/12/2019. Discovery due by 11/29/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/29/2019. (alb) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY from Escambia County Circuit Civil, case number 2019 CA 000671. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4503090.), filed by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (PALMER, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION to Accept Response to #6 Motion to Remand. Plaintiff's #9 Motion is accepted as timely filed. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/9/2019. (alb) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 Defendant, Owners Insurance Company's MOTION to Accept Response to, #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court, #9 Response in Opposition to Motion. (alb) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Defendant, Owners Insurance Company's MOTION to Accept Response to #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court, by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PALMER, ELIZABETH) Modified on 7/8/2019 to clarify title of document (alb). (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PALMER, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court. (No response filed.) (alb) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL Re: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting : Discovery deadline is extended to 2/10/2020., The deadline for filing potentially dispositive motions as well as Daubert motions is 3/10/2020. Mediation to be completed by 3/9/2020. The mediator or parties shall file a report by 3/23/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/2/2019. (alb) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (PALMER, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings re #6 Motion for Remand (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/3/2019). (alb) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First MOTION to Remand to State Court by KIM K LIEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 DEMAND, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2 COUNTEROFFER, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3 COUNTERDEMAND, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4 FULL AND FINAL OFFER, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5 MENDOZA ORDER) (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PALMER, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 Scheduling Order. (No Corporate Disclosures Statement filed.) (alb) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/12/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/12/2019. Discovery due by 11/29/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/29/2019. (alb) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (See proposed ISO.) (alb) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PALMER, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PALMER, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY from Escambia County Circuit Civil, case number 2019 CA 000671. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4503090.), filed by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (PALMER, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.