This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2019 at 07:39:25 (UTC).

Liebscher v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Case Summary

On 06/18/2019 Liebscher filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William B. Shubb and Kendall J. Newman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01114

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William B. Shubb

Referral Judge

Kendall J. Newman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andreas Liebscher

Defendant

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeremy Scott Golden

Attorney at Golden & Cardona-Loya, LLP

3130 Bonita, Suite 200-B

Chula Vista, CA 91910

Defendant Attorneys

Nathan A. Searles

Attorney at PRA Group

140 Corporate Blvd.

Norfolk, VA 23502

Michael R. Simmonds

Attorney at Simmonds and Narita LLP

44 Montgomery St., Suite 3010

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Golden, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

3 #2

VDRP

#4

(#4) ANSWER by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Attorney Searles, Nathan A. added.(Searles, Nathan) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeremy Scott Golden* *Golden & Cardona-Loya, LLP* *3130 Bonita, Suite 200-B* *Chula Vista, CA 91910*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (Searles, Nathan) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC by Andreas Liebscher. Attorney Golden, Jeremy Scott added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8317693) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Golden, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael R. Simmonds on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Attorney Simmonds, Michael R. added. (Simmonds, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

3 #1

Consent Form

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael R. Simmonds on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Attorney Simmonds, Michael R. added. (Simmonds, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Golden, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (Searles, Nathan) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Attorney Searles, Nathan A. added.(Searles, Nathan) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeremy Scott Golden* *Golden & Cardona-Loya, LLP* *3130 Bonita, Suite 200-B* *Chula Vista, CA 91910*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • RECEIPT number 0972-8317693 for $400.00 for filing fee from Jeremy Scott Golden. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC by Andreas Liebscher. Attorney Golden, Jeremy Scott added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8317693) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Golden, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.