This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2020 at 09:12:06 (UTC).

Liebman v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Liebman filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert N. Scola, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-20322

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

 

Party Details

Appellant

Andrea Rosen Liebman

Hallandale, FL 33008

Appellees

Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC

Futura Miami Invest LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

Ari Newman

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A.

333 Se 2Nd Avenue, Suite 4400

Miami, FL 33131

Robert Conrad Meyer

Attorney at Robert C. Meyer, P.A.

2223 Coral Way

Coral Gables, FL 33145

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Marie Clemente on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Attorney Katherine Marie Clemente added to party Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:e). (Clemente, Katherine) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brigid F. Cech Samole on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Attorney Brigid F. Cech Samole added to party Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:e). (Cech Samole, Brigid) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,, filed by Andrea Rosen Liebman (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

1 #1

ORDER FROM USCA CASE #1810495CC, Directing Transmission ti USBC

2 #1

Docket Sheet

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT [Amended and Second Amended] (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 15-13372-AJC, filed by Andrea Rosen Liebman. (Attachments: #1 ORDER FROM USCA CASE #1810495- CC, Directing Transmission to USBC) [*PLEASE NOTE: This Amended NOA was Originally Filed in USCA Case # 1810495CC on 06/29/2018, and RECEIVED by the Bankruptcy Court on 1/22/2020*], [Second Amended NOA was Originally Filed in USCA Case # 1810495CC on 07/09/2018, and RECEIVED by the Bankruptcy Court on 01/22/2020*])(dcn) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Marie Clemente on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Attorney Katherine Marie Clemente added to party Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:e). (Clemente, Katherine) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brigid F. Cech Samole on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Attorney Brigid F. Cech Samole added to party Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:e). (Cech Samole, Brigid) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketSYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5 [service] restricted/sealed until further notice. (jua) (Entered: 01/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • Docket(#6) Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt. Document Filed in Wrong Case; Document restricted and docket text modified. Document refiled in correct case # 20-MC-20262. (jua) (Entered: 01/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#4) Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,, filed by Andrea Rosen Liebman (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT [Amended and Second Amended] (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 15-13372-AJC, filed by Andrea Rosen Liebman. (Attachments: #1 ORDER FROM USCA CASE #1810495- CC, Directing Transmission to USBC) [*PLEASE NOTE: This Amended NOA was Originally Filed in USCA Case # 1810495CC on 06/29/2018, and RECEIVED by the Bankruptcy Court on 1/22/2020*], [Second Amended NOA was Originally Filed in USCA Case # 1810495CC on 07/09/2018, and RECEIVED by the Bankruptcy Court on 01/22/2020*])(dcn) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.