This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2020 at 08:23:27 (UTC).

Lidia Aguilar et al v. TJX Companies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Lidia Aguilar filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TJX Companies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen E. Scott and David O. Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01682

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lidia Aguilar

Brian Aguilar

Defendants

TJX COMPANIES,INC.

Homegoods Inc

DOES 1 through 25, inclusive

TJX Companies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Trevor John Herrera

Attorney at Day Day and Brown

301 West 1St Street

Tustin, CA 92780

Alan Craig Brown

Attorney at Day Day and Brown

301 West 1St Street

Tustin, CA 92780-3108

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey M Lenkov

Attorney at Manning and Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP

801 South Figueroa Street 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3012

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 DAYS, filed by Defendant Homegoods Inc.. (Lenkov, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#8

(#8) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant Homegoods Inc.. (Lenkov, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#6

(#6) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Homegoods Inc, TJX COMPANIES,INC., identifying LIDIA AGUILAR (Plaintiff) BRIAN AGUILAR (Plaintiff) HOMEGOODS, INC. (Defendant). (Lenkov, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Homegoods Inc, TJX COMPANIES,INC.. (Lenkov, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Statement of Damages

1 #2

Exhibit B - Answer to Unverified Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County of Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01150098-CU-PO-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-27943018 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants Homegoods Inc, TJX COMPANIES,INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer to Unverified Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Exhibit C - Statement of Damages) (Attorney Jeffrey M Lenkov added to party Homegoods Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey M Lenkov added to party TJX COMPANIES,INC.(pty:dft))(Lenkov, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 DAYS, filed by Defendant Homegoods Inc.. (Lenkov, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant Homegoods Inc.. (Lenkov, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Homegoods Inc and TJX Companies, Inc. in Orange County Superior Court on 8/31/2020, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Lidia Aguilar and Brian Aguilar in Orange County Superior Court on 7/2/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Homegoods Inc, TJX COMPANIES,INC., identifying LIDIA AGUILAR (Plaintiff) BRIAN AGUILAR (Plaintiff) HOMEGOODS, INC. (Defendant). (Lenkov, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Homegoods Inc, TJX COMPANIES,INC.. (Lenkov, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County of Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01150098-CU-PO-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-27943018 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants Homegoods Inc, TJX COMPANIES,INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer to Unverified Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Exhibit C - Statement of Damages) (Attorney Jeffrey M Lenkov added to party Homegoods Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey M Lenkov added to party TJX COMPANIES,INC.(pty:dft))(Lenkov, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less