This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2020 at 09:03:04 (UTC).

Lickteig

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 Lickteig was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy L. Brooks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-05178

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy L. Brooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Joseph Lickteig

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER of 8USCA requesting any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER be submitted within 10 days. There are no documents to send. (lgd) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#10

(#10) USCA Case Number 20-3251, 8th Circuit Court of Appeals for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Joseph Lickteig. (lgd) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#9

(#9) NOA SUPPLEMENT FORM re #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Joseph Lickteig. (src) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order by Daniel Joseph Lickteig. (src) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Memorandum Opinion and Order by Daniel Joseph Lickteig. (src) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 9, 2020. (src) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Daniel Joseph Lickteig. (src) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#2

(#2) Ex-Parte Declaratory Judgment, filed by Daniel Joseph Lickteig.(src) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Daniel Joseph Lickteig. (src) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER of 8USCA requesting any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER be submitted within 10 days. There are no documents to send. (lgd) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) USCA Case Number 20-3251, 8th Circuit Court of Appeals for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Joseph Lickteig. (lgd) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOA SUPPLEMENT FORM re #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Joseph Lickteig. (src) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order by Daniel Joseph Lickteig. (src) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ONLY ORDER DENYING #6 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. This matter was dismissed without prejudice on October 9th. Today the Clerk received for filing five separate documents. The documents are mostly nonsensical, but the Court's impression is that Plaintiff is either unaware that his case has been dismissed, or he is trying to amend or correct his previous filings, or perhaps he is expressing dissatisfaction with the Court's rulings. Since it does not appear that Plaintiff is attempting to file a notice of appeal, the Court will liberally construe the documents collectively as a Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order of Dismissal [Doc. 5]. The Motion is DENIED because the newly filed documents do not change the Court's opinion that Plaintiff has failed to plead claims for which relief may be granted. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 22, 2020. (Brooks, Timothy) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Memorandum Opinion and Order by Daniel Joseph Lickteig. (src) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 9, 2020. (src) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on October 7, 2020. (smg) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Daniel Joseph Lickteig. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(src) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Daniel Joseph Lickteig. (src) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Ex-Parte Declaratory Judgment, filed by Daniel Joseph Lickteig.(src) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Daniel Joseph Lickteig. (src) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less