This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2021 at 08:23:49 (UTC).

Lichtinger v. The Procter & Gamble Company

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Lichtinger filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against The Procter Gamble Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cathy Seibel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-05646

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Seibel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Liza Lichtinger

Defendant

The Procter & Gamble Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patricia N. Syverson

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint

9655 Granite Ridge Drive, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92123

Carrie Ann Laliberte

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint PC

2325 E Camelback Rd, Suite 300

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Spencer Sheehan

Attorney at Sheehan & Associates, P.C.

60 Cuttermill Road Ste 409, 11021

Great Neck, NY 11021

Elaine A. Ryan

Attorney at Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, P.C.(AZ)

2325 E Camelback Road, Suite 300

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Eric F. Gladbach

Attorney at King & Spalding

1185 Avenue Of The Americas, Ste 34 Floor

New York, NY 10036

George Ruben Morris

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

50 California Street, Suite 3300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jessica Kristen Shook

Attorney at King & Spalding

1185 6Th Avenue

New York, NY 10036

John P. Hooper

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) ORDER granting (22) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 7:21-cv-00186-CS; granting (36) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 7:21-cv-05646-CS. The motion to consolidate is granted on consent. Nos. 21-CV-5646 and 21-CV-5648 are hereby consolidated for all purposes with No. 21-CV-186. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/12/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:21-cv-00186-CS, 7:21-cv-05646-CS, 7:21-cv-05648-CS. (mml) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#27

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#36

(#36) LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 7:21-cv-00186, 7:21-cv-05648 Letter Motion in Agreement with Letter Motion for Consolidation filed in 7:21-cv-00186 addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Patricia N. Syverson dated 8/6/21. Document filed by Liza Lichtinger..(Syverson, Patricia) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

34 #2

Text of Proposed Order

34 #1

Affidavit

#24

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to The Proctor & Gamble Company. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#5

(#5) Application for Refund re 1 New Case Filing Fee, Receipt Number 0971-15837185 by Liza Lichtinger. (Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 4/14/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 4/14/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER granting #39 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application granted. Plaintiffs in all three cases shall file a Consolidated Amended Complaint ("CAC") by 9/2/21. Defendants shall respond, by answering or requesting a premotion conference, in the ordinary course. The 9/3/21 conference is canceled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/23/2021) (mml) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/2/2021. Associated Cases: 7:21-cv-00186-CS, 7:21-cv-05646-CS, 7:21-cv-05648-CS. (mml) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Spencer Sheehan dated August 19, 2021. Document filed by Wendy Keirsted, Liza Lichtinger, Carmen Nieves, Wendy Keirsted.Filed In Associated Cases: 7:21-cv-00186-CS, 7:21-cv-05646-CS, 7:21-cv-05648-CS.(Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER granting (22) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 7:21-cv-00186-CS; granting (36) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 7:21-cv-05646-CS. The motion to consolidate is granted on consent. Nos. 21-CV-5646 and 21-CV-5648 are hereby consolidated for all purposes with No. 21-CV-186. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/12/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:21-cv-00186-CS, 7:21-cv-05646-CS, 7:21-cv-05648-CS. (mml) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 7:21-cv-00186-CS. (mml) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER deferring ruling on #36 Motion to Consolidate Cases: See Doc. 23 in 21-CV-186. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 7:21-cv-00186, 7:21-cv-05648 Letter Motion in Agreement with Letter Motion for Consolidation filed in 7:21-cv-00186 addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Patricia N. Syverson dated 8/6/21. Document filed by Liza Lichtinger..(Syverson, Patricia) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER granting #34 Motion for Patricia N. Syverson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #34 MOTION for Patricia N. Syverson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24888599. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION for Patricia N. Syverson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24888599. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Liza Lichtinger. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Syverson, Patricia) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Judge The Clerk on 4/19/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Liza Lichtinger.. (Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 4/19/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to The Proctor & Gamble Company. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application for Refund re 1 New Case Filing Fee, Receipt Number 0971-15837185 by Liza Lichtinger. (Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 4/14/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/28/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against The Proctor & Gamble Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15837305.). Filed byLiza Lichtinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-CLRA letter, #2 Exhibit B-Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 4/14/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 4/14/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#1) FEE PAID (Filing fee$402,receipt number 0971-15837185). (Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 4/14/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carrie A Laliberte

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patricia N Syverson