This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2021 at 07:17:35 (UTC).

Licgo Partners, LLC et al v. Keith Berman

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 Licgo Partners, LLC filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Keith Berman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02390

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sovereign Partners, LLC

Paradigm Capital Holdings, LLC

Licgo Partners, LLC

Defendants

Decision Diagnostics Corp.

Keith Berman

Pharmatech Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin P Roddy

Attorney at Wilentz Goldman and Spitzer

90 Woodbridge Center Drive Suite 900, P O Box 10

Woodbridge, NJ 07095

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In response to this Order to Show Cause, the Court will accept the following no later than JUNE 16, 2021: BY PLAINTIFFS: PROOFS OF SERVICE AND/OR BY DEFENDANTS: RESPONSES TO THE COMPLAINT OR BY PLAINTIFFS: APPLICATIONS FOR CLERK TO ENTER DEFAULT. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause by June 16, 2021 will result in the dismissal of this action. (iv) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Licgo Partners, LLC, Paradigm Capital Holdings, LLC, Sovereign Partners, LLC, upon Defendant Pharmatech Solutions, Inc. served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Pharmatech Solutions Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Roddy, Kevin) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Licgo Partners, LLC, Paradigm Capital Holdings, LLC, Sovereign Partners, LLC, upon Defendant Decision Diagnostics Corp. served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Decision Diagnostics Corp. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Roddy, Kevin) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Licgo Partners, LLC, Paradigm Capital Holdings, LLC, Sovereign Partners, LLC, upon Defendant Keith Berman served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Keith Berman in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Roddy, Kevin) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint as to Defendant Pharmatech Solutions, Inc. (iv) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint as to Defendant Decision Diagnostics Corp. (iv) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint as to Defendant Keith Berman. (iv) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Document #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - Initial Pleadings and Service - Other Complaint Filings - Amended Complaint. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Licgo Partners, LLC, Paradigm Capital Holdings, LLC, Sovereign Partners, LLC. (iv) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Licgo Partners, LLC, Paradigm Capital Holdings, LLC, Sovereign Partners, LLC. (Roddy, Kevin) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Licgo Partners, LLC, Paradigm Capital Holdings, LLC, Sovereign Partners, LLC. (Roddy, Kevin) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) [AMENDED COMPLAINT Filed as] AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiffs Licgo Partners, LLC, Paradigm Capital Holdings, LLC, Sovereign Partners, LLC. Amendment to Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Errata)(Roddy, Kevin) Modified on 3/23/2021 (iv). (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Paradigm Capital Holdings, LLC identifying PARADIGM CAPITAL HOLDINGS, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Roddy, Kevin) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Sovereign Partners, LLC identifying SOVEREIGN PARTNERS LLC as Corporate Parent. (Roddy, Kevin) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Licgo Partners, LLC identifying LICGO PARTNERS LLC as Corporate Parent. (Roddy, Kevin) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30938809 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFFS LICGO PARTNERS LLC, PARADIGM CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC, SOVEREIGN PARTNERS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Kevin P Roddy added to party LICGO PARTNERS LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin P Roddy added to party PARADIGM CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin P Roddy added to party SOVEREIGN PARTNERS LLC(pty:pla))(Roddy, Kevin) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Decision Diagnostics Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEVIN PETER RODDY