This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/09/2021 at 09:00:11 (UTC).

Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd. v. Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 Library Rights Company UK Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Edward R Pressman Film Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Analisa Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-09396

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Analisa Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd.

Defendants

Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation

Miramax, LLC

Miramax Film Corporation

Miramax Film NY, LLC

ERPFC Releasing, Inc.

Does 1-20

Miramax Film Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Simon Joel Kasha Miller

Attorney at Eisner, LLP

152 West 57Th Street, Ste 48Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorneys

Tom J. Ferber

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Lauren Beth Cooperman

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Lauren Jennifer Fried

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips

2049 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90064

John Michael Gatti

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 1700, 90067

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1614

Other Attorneys

Jeremiah T. Reynolds

Attorney at Eisner, LLP

9601 Wilshire Blvd., 7Th Floor, 90210

Beverly Hills, CA 90401

Katie Pierucci

Attorney at Eisner, A Professional Corporation

9601 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 7Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

 

Court Documents

#45

#44

#43

#42

#41

38 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#38

#36

#34

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Tom J. Ferber dated January 8, 2021 re: permission to file a motion to dismiss. Document filed by ERPFC Releasing, Inc., Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation..(Ferber, Tom) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeremiah Reynolds dated January 5, 2021 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Reynolds, Jeremiah) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 2/8/2021. Responses due by 3/1/2021 Replies due by 3/15/2021. (kv) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER granting #36 Letter Motion for Conference ; denying #42 Letter Motion for Conference. Accordingly: 1. The parties' requests for a pre-motion conference are DENIED; 2. Miramax's request to file a motion to dismiss is GRANTED; 3. By February 8, 2021, Miramax shall file its motion to dismiss; 4. By March 1, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its opposition; and 5. By March 15, 2021, Miramax shall file its reply, if any. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/4/2021) (kv) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #36 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Miramax's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John Gatti dated December 18, 2020. Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd.'s Response Letter addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeremiah Reynolds dated December 28, 2020. Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Reynolds, Jeremiah) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: ERPFC Releasing, Inc. answer due 1/8/2021; Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation answer due 1/8/2021. (ks) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER granting #34 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. By January 8, 2021, the Pressman Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/21/2020) (ks) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER granting #38 Motion for Katherine R. Pierucci to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (ap) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER granting #37 Motion for Jeremiah T. Reynolds to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (ap) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #38 MOTION for Katherine R. Pierucci to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 12/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Simon Joel Kasha Miller to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Miller, Simon) Modified on 11/12/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Miller, Simon) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Miramax, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Miller, Simon) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Miramax Film NY, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Miller, Simon) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Miramax Film Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Miramax Film Corporation..(Miller, Simon) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ERPFC Releasing, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Miller, Simon) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Simon Joel Kasha Miller on behalf of Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd...(Miller, Simon) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Miller, Simon) Modified on 11/12/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ERPFC Releasing, Inc., Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation, Miramax Film Corporation, Miramax Film NY, LLC, Miramax, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22517757)Document filed by Library Rights Company (UK) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(Miller, Simon) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Miramax Film Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where LIBRARY RIGHTS COMPANY UK LTD A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ORGANIZED UNDER THE LAWS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM is a litigant