This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2022 at 20:07:50 (UTC).

Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC v. Comerica Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Comerica Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00080

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC

Defendants

Comerica Incorporated

Comerica Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Terry Afif Saad

Jeffrey Ray Bragalone

Marcus Benavides

Paul Jess Abelkop

Defendant Attorney

Elizabeth L DeRieux

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8830858.), filed by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saad, Terry) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Monument Patent Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Dominion Harbor Enterprises LLC for Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Comerica Bank C/O CORPORATION CREATIONS NETWORK, INC., Comerica Incorporated C/O CORPORATION CREATIONS NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) COMERICA INCORPORATED)(nkl, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

4 #1

Summons(es) COMERICA INCORPORATED

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. Comerica Incorporated served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#6

(#6) FILED IN ERROR Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. (Saad, Terry) Modified on 4/6/2022 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#7

(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC.( Saad, Terry) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2022 02:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/14/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Ray Bragalone on behalf of Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Jess Abelkop on behalf of Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC (Abelkop, Paul) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#13

(#13) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/06/2022

DocketDefendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Comerica Bank to 5/24/2022; Comerica Incorporated to 5/24/2022. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Jess Abelkop on behalf of Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC (Abelkop, Paul) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Ray Bragalone on behalf of Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2022 02:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/14/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022

DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Comerica Bank to 5/9/2022; Comerica Incorporated to 5/9/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022

Docket***FILED IN ERROR - was filed using the wrong docket event. Document # 6, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC.( Saad, Terry) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) FILED IN ERROR Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. (Saad, Terry) Modified on 4/6/2022 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. Comerica Incorporated served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Comerica Bank C/O CORPORATION CREATIONS NETWORK, INC., Comerica Incorporated C/O CORPORATION CREATIONS NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) COMERICA INCORPORATED)(nkl, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2022

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2022

DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Monument Patent Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Dominion Harbor Enterprises LLC for Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8830858.), filed by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saad, Terry) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less