This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2021 at 10:27:22 (UTC).

Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC v. Citigroup Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Citigroup Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00710

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC

Defendants

Citigroup Inc.

CitiBank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Ray Bragalone

Marcus Benavides

Terry A. Saad

Defendant Attorneys

Tonia A. Sayour

Charles E. Phipps

Chelsea A. Loughran

Emma L. Frank

Michael N. Rader

Robert T. Mowrey

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

#12

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or otherwise respond by CitiBank, N.A., Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phipps, Charles) Extended as requested on 8/23/2021 (ir). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tonia A. Sayour for CitiBank, N.A., and for Citigroup Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Chelsea A. Loughran for CitiBank, N.A., and for Citigroup Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Emma L. Frank for CitiBank, N.A., and for Citigroup Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael N. Rader for CitiBank, N.A., and for Citigroup Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert T. Maldonado for CitiBank, N.A., and for Citigroup Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles E. Phipps for Tonia A. Sayour ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15130882) by on behalf of CitiBank, N.A., Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles E. Phipps for Chelsea A. Loughran ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15130858) by on behalf of CitiBank, N.A., Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles E. Phipps for Emma L. Frank ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15130850) by on behalf of CitiBank, N.A., Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles E. Phipps for Michael N. Rader ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15130832) by on behalf of CitiBank, N.A., Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. Citigroup Inc. served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to CitiBank, N.A.. (ir) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Citigroup Inc.. (ir) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. for CitiBank, N.A. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. for Citigroup, Inc. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14991652). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saad, Terry) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less