This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2021 at 10:27:22 (UTC).

Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC v. Citigroup Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Citigroup Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00710

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC

Defendants

Citigroup Inc.

CitiBank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Ray Bragalone

Attorney at Bragalone Olejko Saad PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4600W

Dallas, TX 75201

Marcus Benavides

Attorney at Bragalone Olejko Saad PC

2200 Ross Ave., Suite 4600W

Dallas, TX 75201

Terry A. Saad

Attorney at Bragalone Olejko Saad PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4600W

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

Tonia A. Sayour

Attorney at Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, P.C.

605 Third Avenue, 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10158

Charles E. Phipps

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201

Chelsea A. Loughran

Attorney at Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, P.C.

600 Atlantic Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Emma L. Frank

Attorney at Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, P.C.

600 Atlantic Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Michael N. Rader

Attorney at Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, P.C.

605 Third Avenue, 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10158

Robert T. Mowrey

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201-6766

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

#12

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or otherwise respond by CitiBank, N.A., Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phipps, Charles) Extended as requested on 8/23/2021 (ir). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tonia A. Sayour for CitiBank, N.A., and for Citigroup Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Chelsea A. Loughran for CitiBank, N.A., and for Citigroup Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Emma L. Frank for CitiBank, N.A., and for Citigroup Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael N. Rader for CitiBank, N.A., and for Citigroup Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert T. Maldonado for CitiBank, N.A., and for Citigroup Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles E. Phipps for Tonia A. Sayour ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15130882) by on behalf of CitiBank, N.A., Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles E. Phipps for Chelsea A. Loughran ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15130858) by on behalf of CitiBank, N.A., Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles E. Phipps for Emma L. Frank ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15130850) by on behalf of CitiBank, N.A., Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles E. Phipps for Michael N. Rader ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15130832) by on behalf of CitiBank, N.A., Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. Citigroup Inc. served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to CitiBank, N.A.. (ir) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Citigroup Inc.. (ir) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. for CitiBank, N.A. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. for Citigroup, Inc. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14991652). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Liberty Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saad, Terry) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citigroup Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tonia A Sayour

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Edward Phipps