This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2020 at 10:05:12 (UTC).

Liberty Patents, LLC v. Broadcom Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 Liberty Patents, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Broadcom Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00970

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Liberty Patents, LLC

Defendants

Qualcomm Technologies, Inc.

Broadcom Corporation

Sharp Electronics Corporation

Fujitsu Limited

Broadcom Inc.

MediaTek USA Inc.

STMicroelectronics International N.V.

STMicroelectronics Inc.

Sharp Corporation

MediaTek Inc.

Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited

Broadcom Pte. Ltd.

Qualcomm Inc.

STMicroelectronics N.V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Catherine Bartles

Attorney at Stafford Davis Firm, PC

815 S Broadway Ave

Tyler, TX 75701

Larry D. Thompson

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 450

Houston, TX 77006

Matthew Antonelli

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 450

Houston, TX 77006

Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis

Attorney at The Stafford Davis Firm, PC

815 South Broadway Avenue

Tyler, TX 75701

Zachariah Harrington

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 450

Houston, TX 77006

C. Ryan Pinckney

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 450

Houston, TX 77006

Rehan M. Safiullah

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd. - Suite 450

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew William Cornelia

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

2000 Mckinney Ave., Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75214

Tyler T. VanHoutan

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

600 Travis Street, Suite 7500

Houston, TX 77002

Eric Stephen Schlichter

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

600 Travis St., Suite 7500

Houston, TX 77002

Justin S. Cohen

Attorney at Thompson & Knight, LLP

1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Bruce S. Sostek

Attorney at Thompson & Knight LLP

1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

58 #1

Proposed Order

#58

(#58) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by STMicroelectronics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#57

(#57) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Patents, LLC. STMicroelectronics N.V. served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#56

(#56) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Patents, LLC. STMicroelectronics International N.V. served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#55

(#55) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Patents, LLC. STMicroelectronics Inc. served on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#54

(#54) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Patents, LLC. Sharp Electronics Corporation served on 11/13/2020, answer due 2/10/2021. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#53

(#53) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Patents, LLC. Sharp Corporation served on 11/13/2020, answer due 2/10/2021. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#52

(#52) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Patents, LLC. Qualcomm Technologies, Inc. served on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#51

(#51) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Patents, LLC. Qualcomm Inc. served on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#8

(#8) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Liberty Patents, LLC. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan M. Safiullah on behalf of Liberty Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Ryan Pinckney on behalf of Liberty Patents, LLC (Pinckney, C.) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry D. Thompson on behalf of Liberty Patents, LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Antonelli on behalf of Liberty Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14078279). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Liberty Patents, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness In Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by STMicroelectronics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Patents, LLC. STMicroelectronics N.V. served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Patents, LLC. STMicroelectronics International N.V. served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Patents, LLC. STMicroelectronics Inc. served on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Patents, LLC. Sharp Electronics Corporation served on 11/13/2020, answer due 2/10/2021. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Patents, LLC. Sharp Corporation served on 11/13/2020, answer due 2/10/2021. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Patents, LLC. Qualcomm Technologies, Inc. served on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Patents, LLC. Qualcomm Inc. served on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Patents, LLC. MediaTek USA Inc. served on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Patents, LLC. MediaTek Inc. served on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of Liberty Patents, LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Liberty Patents, LLC. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan M. Safiullah on behalf of Liberty Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Ryan Pinckney on behalf of Liberty Patents, LLC (Pinckney, C.) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry D. Thompson on behalf of Liberty Patents, LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Antonelli on behalf of Liberty Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14078279). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Liberty Patents, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness In Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Broadcom PTE. Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Fujitsu Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Patents is a litigant