Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 10:40:12 (UTC).

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company v. Boullion et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 Liberty Mutual Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Boullion. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah S. Vance, Michael North and Wendy B Vitter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-09845

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael North

Presiding Judges

Sarah S. Vance

Wendy B Vitter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Defendants

Donavon J Steib

Israel J Steib

Joseph Eric Courville

Patsy Soileau Courville

Kevin M Neyrey

Daniel Joseph Boullion

Dwane J Steib

Michael Wade Courville

Amanda Granier Steib

Mavis Todd Courville

Mary Patsy Soileau Courville

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen R. Klaffky

Attorney at Barrasso, Usdin, Kupperman, Freeman & Sarver, LLC

909 Poydras St., Suite 2350

New Orleans, LA 70112

Susan Muller Rogge

Attorney at Barrasso, Usdin, Kupperman, Freeman & Sarver, LLC

909 Poydras St., Suite 2350

New Orleans, LA 70112

H. Minor Pipes, III

Attorney at Barrasso, Usdin, Kupperman, Freeman & Sarver, LLC

909 Poydras St., Suite 2350

New Orleans, LA 70112

Robert A. Kole

Attorney at Choate Hall & Stewart, LLP

Two International Place, 100-150 Oliver St.

Boston, MA 02110

Douglas R. Gooding

Attorney at Choate Hall & Stewart, LLP

Two International Place, 100-150 Oliver St.

Boston, MA 02110

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Brett Clement

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Lauren Roussel Clement

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Benjamin Peter Dinehart

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Gerolyn Petit Roussel

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Ashley L. Belleau

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard (New Orleans)

60L Poydras St., Suite 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) NOTICE regarding oral argument re #22 Rule 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Amanda Granier Steib, Mavis Todd Courville, Dwane J Steib, Donavon J Steib, Mary Patsy Soileau Courville, Daniel Joseph Boullion, Michael Wade Courville, Joseph Eric Courville, Israel J Steib. By Clerk.(mmv) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

22 #11

Exhibit 8

22 #10

Exhibit 7

22 #9

Exhibit 6

22 #8

Exhibit 5

22 #5

Exhibit 2

22 #4

Exhibit 1

22 #3

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

22 #1

Memorandum in Support

5 #4

Proposed Order

5 #1

Affidavit

#5

(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Douglas R. Gooding. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/8/2019. (mm) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

4 #4

Summons to All Defendants

4 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against Daniel Joseph Boullion, Joseph Eric Courville, Mary Patsy Soileau Courville, Mavis Todd Courville, Michael Wade Courville, Kevin M Neyrey, Amanda Granier Steib, Donavon J Steib, Dwane J Steib, Israel J Steib (Fee previously paid) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to All Defendants)(Klaffky, Stephen) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER: Plaintiffs motion to seal is DENIED, and the Court instead orders plaintiff to file into the record a redacted complaint. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/3/2019.(mm) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE regarding oral argument re #22 Rule 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Amanda Granier Steib, Mavis Todd Courville, Dwane J Steib, Donavon J Steib, Mary Patsy Soileau Courville, Daniel Joseph Boullion, Michael Wade Courville, Joseph Eric Courville, Israel J Steib. By Clerk.(mmv) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company regarding #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pipes, H.) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Redacted). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pipes, H.) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Memorandum in Opposition to Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Pleading Placeholder)(Pipes, H.) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #28 Scheduling Order. **Document filed in error, and will be noted as such. No further action necessary.** (jeg) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) **ERROR** SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Bench Trial set for 3/9/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. All discovery must be completed by 1/9/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jeg) Modified on 6/10/2019 (jeg). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER GRANTIED #24 MOTION to Continue Submission Date on #22 Motion to Dismiss, and that thesubmission date of R. Doc. 22 is hereby continued until 7/10/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/10/2019.(jeg) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Isreal J. Steib served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Klaffky, Stephen) Modified text on 6/7/2019 (jeg). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Daniel Joseph Boullion served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Klaffky, Stephen) Modified text on 6/7/2019 (jeg). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date #22 Motion to Dismiss by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pipes, H.) Modified text on 6/6/2019. (jeg) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Donavon J Steib served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (Klaffky, Stephen) Modified text/event/answer due date on 5/21/2019 (mm). (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Summons Returned Executed. **Filing attorney selected the incorrect party served and entered the incorrect date served. Correct party served was Amanda Granier Steib on 5/16/2019.** (mm) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Amanda Granier Steib served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (Klaffky, Stephen) Modified text/party served/answer due date on 5/17/2019 (mm). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert A. Kole. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/8/2019. (mm) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Douglas R. Gooding. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/8/2019. (mm) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Daniel Joseph Boullion, Joseph Eric Courville, Mary Patsy Soileau Courville, Mavis Todd Courville, Michael Wade Courville, Kevin M Neyrey, Amanda Granier Steib, Donavon J Steib, Dwane J Steib, Israel J Steib. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(mm) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Robert A. Kole) (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7629803) by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 E-File Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Pipes, H.) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Douglas R. Gooding) (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7629760) by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 E-File Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Pipes, H.) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against Daniel Joseph Boullion, Joseph Eric Courville, Mary Patsy Soileau Courville, Mavis Todd Courville, Michael Wade Courville, Kevin M Neyrey, Amanda Granier Steib, Donavon J Steib, Dwane J Steib, Israel J Steib (Fee previously paid) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to All Defendants)(Klaffky, Stephen) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: Plaintiffs motion to seal is DENIED, and the Court instead orders plaintiff to file into the record a redacted complaint. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/3/2019.(mm) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert A. Kole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Susan Muller Rogge

Latest cases represented by Lawyer H. Minor Pipes, III