This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/15/2020 at 08:56:11 (UTC).

RLI Insurance Company et al v. Ceradyne, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 RLI Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Ceradyne, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01997

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RLI INSURANCE COMPANY

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

CERADYNE, INC.

DOES 1-30

Does 1-30, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Dale Prough

Attorney at Morison and Prough LLP

2540 Camino Diablo Suite 100

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Paul Henry Burleigh

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

777 South Figueroa Street Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Ronald P. Schiller

Attorney at Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin and Schiller

One Logan Square 27Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 91903

Bonnie M. Hoffman

Attorney at Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin and Schiller

One Logan Square 27Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

James R. Murray

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1271 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Jared Zola

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1271 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Linda Diane Kornfeld

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Julia Katheryn Holt

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

31 #13

Exhibit D to Declaration of Jared Zola

31 #12

Exhibit C to Declaration of Jared Zola

31 #11

Exhibit B to Declaration of Jared Zola

31 #10

Exhibit A to Declaration of Jared Zola

31 #7

Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice

31 #6

Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice

31 #5

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Ceradyne, Inc.'s Motio

31 #4

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by

#31

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit C - Liberty Policy

1 #2

Exhibit B - RLI Policy

1 #1

Exhibit A - Primary Policy

#1

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Ceradyne, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/25/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion by Defendant Ceradyne, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Defendant Ceradyne, Inc., #5 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Ceradyne, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Exhibit C to Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Declaration of Jared Zola in Support of Defendant Ceradyne, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jared Zola, #11 Exhibit B to Declaration of Jared Zola, #12 Exhibit C to Declaration of Jared Zola, #13 Exhibit D to Declaration of Jared Zola) (Holt, Julia) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer or Motion to Stay Proceedings #19 filed by Defendant Ceradyne, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jared Zola in Support of Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jared Zola, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Jared Zola, #4 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay, #5 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Holt, Julia) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON CERADYNE, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TRANSFER OR STAY #28 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Hearing on the Motion is continued from 12/14/2020 to 12/21/2020 at 1:30 P.M.; 2. The time for filing Defendant Ceradyne Inc.'s reply papers as to the Motion is continued from November 30, 2020 to December 7, 2020. (es) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) STIPULATION to Continue Motion to Dismiss from December 14, 2020 to December 21, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer or Motion to Stay Proceedings #19 filed by Defendant Ceradyne, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holt, Julia) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer or Motion to Stay Proceedings #19 Filed by Plaintiff Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and filed by Plaintiff RLI Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration John E. Howell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Prough, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, RLI Insurance Company. as to Amended Complaint/Petition #24 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Burleigh, Paul) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, RLI Insurance Company.. (Burleigh, Paul) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT Ceradyne, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff RLI Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(Burleigh, Paul) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Franting #22 Non-Resident Attorney Bonnie M. Hoffman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, designating Paul H. Burleigh as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bonnie M. Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29004369) filed by Plaintiff Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Burleigh, Paul) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, upon Defendant Ceradyne, Inc. served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Staus, Registered Agent, authorized agent CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Burleigh, Paul) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Ceradyne, Inc. (esa) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff RLI INSURANCE COMPANY identifying RLI CORP. as Corporate Parent. (Prough, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Liberty Mutual Insurance Company LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, identifying Plaintiff LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a wholly-owned (100%) subsidiary of Liberty Mutual Group Inc., which is a wholly-owned (100%) subsidiary of LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc. which is a wholly-owned (100%) subsidiary of Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. No publicly held entity owns 10% or more of the stock of Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc.. (Burleigh, Paul) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Burleigh, Paul) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Liberty Mutual Insurance Company LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Burleigh, Paul) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28574257 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Liberty Mutual Insurance Company LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Primary Policy, #2 Exhibit B - RLI Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Liberty Policy) (Attorney Paul Henry Burleigh added to party LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla))(Burleigh, Paul) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ceradyne, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where RLI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julia K Holt