This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2021 at 08:32:26 (UTC).

Liberty Insurance Corporation v. HNTB Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 Liberty Insurance Corporation filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HNTB Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen R. Bough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00641

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen R. Bough

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Liberty Insurance Corporation

Counter Claimant and Defendant

HNTB Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Angela Higgins Clark

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC - KCMO

2400 Pershing Road, Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2504

John L. Kellogg

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC - KCMO

2400 Pershing Road, Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2504

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Scott David Hofer

Attorney at Foland Wickens Roper Hofer & Crawford - KCMO

1200 Main Street, Suite 2200

Kansas City, MO 64105

William F Logan

Attorney at Foland Wickens Roper Hofer & Crawford - KCMO

1200 Main Street, Suite 2200

Kansas City, MO 64105

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - CGL Policy

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Umbrella Policy

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

MAP General Order

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. HNTB Corporation served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Clark, Angela) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of appearance by Scott David Hofer on behalf of HNTB Corporation (Attorney Scott David Hofer added to party HNTB Corporation(pty:dft))(Hofer, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of appearance by William F Logan on behalf of HNTB Corporation (Attorney William F Logan added to party HNTB Corporation(pty:dft))(Logan, William) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Liberty Insurance Corporation on behalf of HNTB Corporation.(Hofer, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Scott David Hofer on behalf of Defendant HNTB Corporation.(Hofer, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#9

(#9) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/19/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2021 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 10/5/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Counterclaim on behalf of Liberty Insurance Corporation.(Clark, Angela) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Counterclaim on behalf of Liberty Insurance Corporation.(Clark, Angela) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/19/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2021 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 10/5/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Scott David Hofer on behalf of Defendant HNTB Corporation.(Hofer, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Liberty Insurance Corporation on behalf of HNTB Corporation.(Hofer, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of appearance by William F Logan on behalf of HNTB Corporation (Attorney William F Logan added to party HNTB Corporation(pty:dft))(Logan, William) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of appearance by Scott David Hofer on behalf of HNTB Corporation (Attorney Scott David Hofer added to party HNTB Corporation(pty:dft))(Hofer, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. HNTB Corporation served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Clark, Angela) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to HNTB Corporation. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Angela Higgins Clark on behalf of Plaintiff Liberty Insurance Corporation.(Clark, Angela) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against HNTB Corporation filed by Angela Higgins Clark on behalf of Liberty Insurance Corporation. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7568938. Service due by 12/2/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - CGL Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Umbrella Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clark, Angela) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HNTB CORPORATION A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Insurance Corporation is a litigant