This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2020 at 09:11:19 (UTC).

Liberty Insurance Corporation et al v. LSP Products Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Liberty Insurance Corporation filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against LSP Products Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas L. Ludington and Patricia T. Morris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-12814

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Ludington

Referral Judge

Patricia T. Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Liberty Insurance Corporation

The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Defendant

LSP Products Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John M. McManus

Attorney at McManus Law

117 W. Fourth St., Suite 201

Royal Oak, MI 48067

Defendant Attorneys

Paul A. McCarthy

Attorney at Rhoades McKee PC

55 Campau Avenue Nw, Suite 300

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Patrick E. Sweeney

Attorney at Rhoades McKee PC

55 Campau Avenue, N.W., Suite 300

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Case Management and SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/15/2021; Settlement Conference set for 6/23/2021 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/15/2021; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2021 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Jury Trial set for 11/16/2021 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Refer to image for additional dates) (KWin) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' #6 Motion Opposition to Severance and Remand. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION Opposition to Severance and Remand by All Plaintiffs. (McManus, John) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#5

(#5) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LSP Products Group, Inc. (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. (Short Statements Submitted to CM/Utilities/Proposed Orders by 11/13/2020. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by LSP Products Group, Inc.. (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Patrick E. Sweeney appearing on behalf of LSP Products Group, Inc. (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LSP Products Group, Inc. from 10th Judicial Circuit for the County of Saginaw, case number 20-042811-NP. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8116907 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: First Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada, 18-TRT-00015-1B, Judge James E. Wilson, Jr.] [Possible companion case(s): None] (McCarthy, Paul) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case Management and SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/15/2021; Settlement Conference set for 6/23/2021 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/15/2021; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2021 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Jury Trial set for 11/16/2021 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Refer to image for additional dates) (KWin) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' #6 Motion Opposition to Severance and Remand. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketRE-Set Deadlines: Short Statements to be Submitted to CM/Utilities/Proposed Orders due by 11/30/2020 (From 11/13/2020). (KWin) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION Opposition to Severance and Remand by All Plaintiffs. (McManus, John) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LSP Products Group, Inc. (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. (Short Statements Submitted to CM/Utilities/Proposed Orders by 11/13/2020. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by LSP Products Group, Inc.. (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Patrick E. Sweeney appearing on behalf of LSP Products Group, Inc. (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LSP Products Group, Inc. from 10th Judicial Circuit for the County of Saginaw, case number 20-042811-NP. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8116907 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: First Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada, 18-TRT-00015-1B, Judge James E. Wilson, Jr.] [Possible companion case(s): None] (McCarthy, Paul) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LSP Products Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul A McCarthy(Designation Retained)