This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2022 at 07:39:39 (UTC).

Li v. Garland et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Li filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Garland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John R. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00321

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Adams

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Su Yu Li

Respondents

U.S. Attorney General

Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security

Director of the U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Vlad A. Kuzmin

Attorney at Kuzmin Law

21St Floor, 225 Broadway Avenue

New York, NY 10007

Respondent Attorneys

Michael James Byars

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - New York

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

Lisa Hammond Johnson

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Rema A. Ina

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's Motion to stay (Related Doc #20 ); granting Defendant's Motion to amend the motion to stay (Related Doc #21 ). The matter is hereby stayed pending administrative proceedings. The CMC set for 4/21/2022 is hereby canceled. Judge John R. Adams on 4/19/2022.(L,J) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

19 #5

ECF Policies and Procedures

19 #4

Budget

19 #3

Magistrate Consent Form

19 #2

Local Rule 30.1

19 #1

Report of Parties' Planning Meeting

19 #19

Main Document

#18

RESTRICTED

#17

RESTRICTED

#15

No Description Available

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's Motion to stay (Related Doc #20 ); granting Defendant's Motion to amend the motion to stay (Related Doc #21 ). The matter is hereby stayed pending administrative proceedings. The CMC set for 4/21/2022 is hereby canceled. Judge John R. Adams on 4/19/2022.(L,J) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Motion to Amend Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Director of the U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney General. Related document(s) #20 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Relocation Memorandum)(Ina, Rema) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Motion to stay proceedings filed by Director of the U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Interview Notice)(Ina, Rema) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with telephonic case management conference to be held on 4/21/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge John R. Adams. Judge John R. Adams on 4/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Local Rule 30.1, #3 Magistrate Consent Form, #4 Budget, #5 ECF Policies and Procedures)(L,J) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joint Attorney Appearance and Substitution of Counsel by Rema A. Ina and Lisa Hammond Johnson filed by on behalf of Director of the U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney General. (Ina, Rema) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketNotice to Attorney Vlad Anatole Kuzmin. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of docket sheet and #17 Magistrate Consent Form mailed to Vlad Anatole Kuzmin, Kuzmin & Associates, PLLC, 225 Broadway, 21st Flr, New York, NY 10007 and Michael James Byars, U.S. Attorney's Office, SDNY (Chambers Street), 86 Chambers Street, New York, NY 10007 on 02/28/2022. (M,TL) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (M,TL) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketJudge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas.Document filed by Su Yu Li..(Kuzmin, Vlad) [Transferred from nysd on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Vlad Anatole Kuzmin to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons Caption Party Name Error. Party names must correspond to pleading caption.The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. [Transferred from nysd on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Vlad Anatole Kuzmin to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. The pleading title does not correspond to Complaint/Petition event type selected in ECF. When prompted indicate if document is a Complaint or Petition as it corresponds to your PDF title; and the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 10/18/2021. (vf) [Transferred from nysd on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Vlad Anatole Kuzmin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:706(a) Writ of Mandamus; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf) [Transferred from nysd on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Vlad Anatole Kuzmin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Su Yu Li, Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur. M. Jaddou. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (vf) [Transferred from nysd on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kuzmin, Vlad) [Transferred from nysd on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ur M. Jaddou, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Su Yu Li..(Kuzmin, Vlad) Modified on 10/13/2021 (vf). [Transferred from nysd on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Su Yu Li..(Kuzmin, Vlad) Modified on 10/13/2021 (vf). [Transferred from nysd on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merrick Garland, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Su Yu Li..(Kuzmin, Vlad) Modified on 10/13/2021 (vf). [Transferred from nysd on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PETITION IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25183587).Document filed by Su Yu Li..(Kuzmin, Vlad) Modified on 10/13/2021 (vf). [Transferred from nysd on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary, Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rema A Ina

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa Hammond Johnson