This case was last updated from PACER on 10/09/2021 at 08:36:26 (UTC).

L.H. v. MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 L H filed an Other lawsuit against MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert N. Scola, Jr and Jonathan Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-22894

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L.H.

Defendants

Marriott International, Inc.

Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.

G6 Hospitality LLC

Six Continensl Hotels, Inc.

Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC

Craigslist, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda J.G. Walbrun

Attorney at Levin Simes Abrams LLP

1700 Montgomery Street, Suite 250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Brian J. Perkins

Attorney at Levin Simes Abrams LLP

1700 Montgomery Street, Suite 250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Erik L. Bauer

Attorney at The Law Office of Erik L. Bauer

215 Tacoma Avenue South

Tacoma, WA 98402

Susanna L. Southworth

Attorney at The Law Office of Erik L. Bauer

215 Tacoma Avenue South

Tacoma, WA 98402

Kathryn Leigh Avila

Attorney at Levin Papantonio

8395 Untreiner Avenue

Pensacola, FL 32534

Kimberly Lambert Adams

Attorney at Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Echsner & Procter

316 S Baylen Street, Suite 600

Pensacola, FL 32502

Defendant Attorney

Ernest A. Cox, IV

Attorney at Gunster, Yoakley, and Stewart

777 South Flagler Drive, Suite 500 East

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Craigslist, Inc.. Attorney Ernest A. Cox, IV added to party Craigslist, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Ernest) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #15 and #16 counsel's motions to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Amanda J.G. Walbrun and Brian J. Perkins, both of the law firm of Levin Simes Abrams LLP, are given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to provide these attorneys with notification of all electronic filings via the email addresses set forth in the motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (kbe) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Craigslist, Inc., G6 Hospitality LLC, Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Marriott International, Inc., filed by L.H..(Adams, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian J. Perkins. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15000842 by L.H.. Responses due by 9/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Avila, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Amanda J.G. Walbrun. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15000817 by L.H.. Responses due by 9/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Avila, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Clerks Notice to Filer re #13 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (jao) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Craigslist, Inc., G6 Hospitality LLC, Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Marriott International, Inc., filed by L.H..(Avila, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #10 and #11 counsel's motions to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Erik L. Bauer and Susanna L. Southworth, both of the law firm of Erik L. Bauer, are given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to provide these attorneys with notification of all electronic filings via the email addresses set forth in the motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (kbe) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Susanna L. Southworth. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14939384 by L.H.. Responses due by 9/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Avila, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Erik L. Bauer. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14939365 by L.H.. Responses due by 9/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Avila, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (jao) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by L.H..(Adams, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Striking #1 Complaint, filed by L.H. by L.H. (Adams, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Clerks Notice to Filer re #1 Complaint,. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (jao) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Erik L. Bauer, Susanna L. Southworth, Brian J. Perkins, Amanda J.G. Walburn, mailing date August 10, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Craigslist, Inc., G6 Hospitality LLC, Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Six Continensl Hotels, Inc. (jao) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) STRICKEN per DE #6 COMPLAINT against L.H.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14913437, filed by L.H.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s))(Adams, Kimberly) Modified on 8/11/2021 (jao). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where L.H. is a litigant

Latest cases where G6 HOSPITALITY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC is a litigant