This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2022 at 08:29:20 (UTC).

LG Electronics, Inc. v. Dolby Laboratories, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 LG Electronics, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Dolby Laboratories, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lewis A. Kaplan and Paul A. Crotty. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00042

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lewis A. Kaplan

Paul A. Crotty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LG Electronics, Inc.

Defendants

Dolby Laboratories, Inc.

Dolby International AB

Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Thomas Weingaertner

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY)

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

David Hysom Suggs

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY)

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

John Paul Padro

Attorney at White & Case

1221 Avenue Of The Americas, Ste 47.084

New York, NY 10020

Laura Logsdon

Attorney at White & Case

1221 Avenue Of The Americas, Ste 47079

Ny, NY 10020

Matthew Robert Wisnieff

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY)

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Raj Suresh Gandesha

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY)

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Robert A. Milne

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY)

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Defendant Attorneys

Catherine Nyarady

Attorney at Paul Weiss (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Meredith Richardson Dearborn

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

535 Mission Street, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

William Baly Michael

Attorney at Paul Weiss (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Darren Wright Johnson

Attorney at Paul Weiss (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#57

(#57) STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the respective parties, that all of Plaintiff's claims in this case are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that, as to all claims asserted in this case, each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/28/2022) (tg) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#56

(#56) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc...(Weingaertner, Scott) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#55

(#55) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Weingaertner, Scott) Modified on 2/28/2022 (tp). (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#53

RESTRICTED

#51

RESTRICTED

#50

(#50) LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Scott T. Weingaertner dated February 14, 2022. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc...(Weingaertner, Scott) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#12

(#49) DECLARATION of Jerry A. Hausman (REDACTED) in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Hausman Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to the Hausman Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to the Hausman Declaration (REDACTED)).(Michael, William) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

1 #13

Ex M

1 #12

Ex L

1 #10

Ex J

1 #7

Ex G

1 #6

Ex F

1 #5

Ex E

1 #3

Ex C

1 #2

Ex B

1 #1

Ex A

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the respective parties, that all of Plaintiff's claims in this case are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that, as to all claims asserted in this case, each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/28/2022) (tg) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc...(Weingaertner, Scott) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Scott Weingaertner to RE-FILE Document #55 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal; the document was not signed by all parties who have appeared. Use the event type Proposed Stipulation and Order found under the event list Proposed Orders and attach the correct signed (scanned signature ink image) PDF. (tp) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Weingaertner, Scott) Modified on 2/28/2022 (tp). (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Justin V. Lewis in Support re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #50 .(Weingaertner, Scott) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY Declaration of Dr. Allan Shampine in Support of #12 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted]. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #50 .(Weingaertner, Scott) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Myungin Ko in Support re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #50 .(Weingaertner, Scott) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted]. . Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #50 .(Weingaertner, Scott) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Scott T. Weingaertner dated February 14, 2022. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc...(Weingaertner, Scott) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) DECLARATION of Jerry A. Hausman (REDACTED) in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Redacted].. Document filed by Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Hausman Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to the Hausman Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to the Hausman Declaration (REDACTED)).(Michael, William) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent LG Corporation for LG Electronics, Inc.. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc...(Weingaertner, Scott) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docket(#3) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketORDER TO FILE REDACTED COMPLAINT FILED IN 21-MC-862. Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc. (vf) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation. (vf) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Dolby International AB. (vf) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Dolby Laboratories, Inc. (vf) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (vf) (pc). (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Dolby International AB, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby Laboratories, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 465401291611)Document filed by LG Electronics, Inc.(vf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2022: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Ex E, #6 Ex F, #7 Ex G, #8 Ex H, #9 Ex I, #10 Ex J, #11 Ex K, #12 Ex L, #13 Ex M, #14 Ex N) (pc). (Attachment 7 replaced on 1/5/2022) (pc). (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dolby Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meredith Richardson Dearborn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William B. Michael