This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/17/2022 at 07:41:02 (UTC).

LFS Inc v. Diversified Maintenance Systems Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 LFS Inc filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against Diversified Maintenance Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wyoming District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott W Skavdahl and Kelly H Rankin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00086

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott W Skavdahl

Referral Judge

Kelly H Rankin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LFS Inc United States of America for the use and benefit of doing business as LFS Group

Defendants

Diversified Maintenance Systems Inc

Employers Mutual Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Judith A Studer

Attorney at SCHWARTZ BON WALKER & STUDER

141 South Center Street, Suite 500

Casper, WY 82601

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan O Hafen

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 South 200 East, Suite 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan O Hafen on behalf of Diversified Maintenance Systems Inc, Employers Mutual Casualty Company (Hafen, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#13

(#13) CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed against Defendants Diversified Maintenance Systems, Inc. and Employers Mutual Casualty Company by the Clerk of Court, Margaret Botkins. (Copy sent to defendants via certified and regular U.S. mail.) (Court Staff, skb) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl denying #10 Motion for Default Judgment. (Court Staff, skb) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LFS Inc. Employers Mutual Casualty Company served on 4/25/2022, answer due on 5/16/2022 (Studer, Judith) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LFS Inc. Diversified Maintenance Systems Inc served on 4/21/2022, answer due on 5/12/2022 (Studer, Judith) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued. (Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#6

(#6) Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff LFS Inc (Studer, Judith) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/29/2022 to flatten summons) (Court Staff, skb). (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#5

(#5) Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff LFS Inc (Studer, Judith) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/29/2022 to flatten summons) (Court Staff, skb). (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl (Presiding Judge) and the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Referral Judge). (Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by d/b/a LFS Group LFS Inc.,. (Studer, Judith) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff LFS Inc; this case is non-complex. (Studer, Judith) Modified text on 4/18/2022 (Court Staff, stbd). (Entered: 04/18/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by LFS Inc against All Defendants with Jury Demand. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number AWYDC-2090324) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Studer, Judith) Modified text on 4/18/2022 (Court Staff, stbd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2022: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, stbd). (Entered: 04/18/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Set Aside #14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Diversified Maintenance Systems, Inc. and Employers Mutual Casualty Company, #13 Default, filed by Defendants Diversified Maintenance Systems Inc, Employers Mutual Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Jonathan O. Hafen, #2 Exhibit B-Declaration of Timothy Miguel Willardson, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Set Aside Default)(Hafen, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan O Hafen on behalf of Diversified Maintenance Systems Inc, Employers Mutual Casualty Company (Hafen, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Diversified Maintenance Systems, Inc. and Employers Mutual Casualty Company filed by Plaintiff LFS Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Default Judgment)(Studer, Judith) Modified event and text on 5/31/2022 (Court Staff, skb). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed against Defendants Diversified Maintenance Systems, Inc. and Employers Mutual Casualty Company by the Clerk of Court, Margaret Botkins. (Copy sent to defendants via certified and regular U.S. mail.) (Court Staff, skb) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Entry of Default against Diversified Maintenance Systems, Inc. and Employers Mutual Casualty Company filed by Plaintiff LFS Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default to Clerk)(Studer, Judith) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl denying #10 Motion for Default Judgment. (Court Staff, skb) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Plaintiff LFS Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default try of De)(Studer, Judith) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LFS Inc. Employers Mutual Casualty Company served on 4/25/2022, answer due on 5/16/2022 (Studer, Judith) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LFS Inc. Diversified Maintenance Systems Inc served on 4/21/2022, answer due on 5/12/2022 (Studer, Judith) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued. (Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff LFS Inc (Studer, Judith) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/29/2022 to flatten summons) (Court Staff, skb). (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff LFS Inc (Studer, Judith) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/29/2022 to flatten summons) (Court Staff, skb). (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl (Presiding Judge) and the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Referral Judge). (Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by d/b/a LFS Group LFS Inc.,. (Studer, Judith) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff LFS Inc; this case is non-complex. (Studer, Judith) Modified text on 4/18/2022 (Court Staff, stbd). (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by LFS Inc against All Defendants with Jury Demand. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number AWYDC-2090324) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Studer, Judith) Modified text on 4/18/2022 (Court Staff, stbd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2022: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, stbd). (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Diversified Maintenance Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPLOYERS MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan O. Hafen