This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2021 at 10:08:27 (UTC).

LFO, Inc. et al v. Hyundai Motor America et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 LFO, Inc filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hyundai Motor America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is James K. Bredar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01572

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James K. Bredar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LFO, Inc. doing business as Fitzgerald's Lakeforest Hyundai

CDOHY, Inc. doing business as Fitzgerald Hyundai

LFO, Inc. doing business as Fitzgerald Genesis of Gaithersburg doing business as Fitzgerald's Lakeforest Hyundai

CDOHY, Inc. doing business as Fitzgerald Genesis of Rockville doing business as Fitzgerald Hyundai

Defendants

Hyundai Motor America

Genesis Motor America LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lawrence F Regan, Jr

Attorney at Montero Law Group, LLC

1738 Elton Road- Ste. 105

Silver Spring, MD 20903

Jude Edward Wikramanayake

Attorney at Montero Law Group, LLC

1738 Elton Rd Ste 105

Silver Spring, MD 20903

John W Forehand

Attorney at Kurkin Forehand Brandes LLP

1089 W. Morse Blvd., Suite D

Winter Park, FL 32789

R Craig Spickard

Attorney at Kurkin Forehand Brandes LLP

1089 W. Morse Blvd Ste D

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendant Attorneys

Antonio M Elias

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

555 Thirteenth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Michael Turrill

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Ste 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ryan L Ford

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

555 Thirteenth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Marc A Marinaccio

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

100 International Dr Ste 2000

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

25 #6

Fitzgerald Genesis State Court Notice of Filing of Removal

25 #5

Fitzgerald Genesis State Court Affidavit of Service

25 #4

Fitzgerald Genesis State Court Summons

25 #3

Fitzgerald Hyundai State Court Notice of Filing of Removal

25 #2

Fitzgerald Hyundai State Court Affidavit of Service

25 #1

Fitzgerald Hyundai State Court Summons

#25

#24

#23

#4

3 #1

Case Information Sheet

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit C - Civil Non-Domestic Case Information Report

1 #3

Exhibit B - Writ of Summons

1 #2

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Under Local Rule 103.5(a) and Additional Documents on File in State Court Action by Marc A Marinaccio on behalf of Genesis Motor America LLC, Hyundai Motor America (Attachments: #1 Fitzgerald Hyundai State Court Summons, #2 Fitzgerald Hyundai State Court Affidavit of Service, #3 Fitzgerald Hyundai State Court Notice of Filing of Removal, #4 Fitzgerald Genesis State Court Summons, #5 Fitzgerald Genesis State Court Affidavit of Service, #6 Fitzgerald Genesis State Court Notice of Filing of Removal)(Marinaccio, Marc) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion to Consolidate Cases, JKB-21-1572 and ELH-21-1573. All future filings to be filed in this case only. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/23/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Hyundai Motor America(Marinaccio, Marc) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 7/22/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for Settlement. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/21/2021. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/18/2022. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum to Counsel Regarding Discovery Procedures)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketScheduled Telephone Conference held on 7/20/2021 before Chief Judge James K. Bredar.(Court Reporter: None) (mds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of R Craig Spickard. Directing attorney R Craig Spickard to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 7/9/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John W Forehand. Directing attorney John W Forehand to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 7/9/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for R. Craig Spickard (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9370270.) by CDOHY, Inc., LFO, Inc.(Regan, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(vdcs, Chambers) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Hyundai Motor America.(Marinaccio, Marc) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE re #4 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Hyundai Motor America.(Marinaccio, Marc) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by LFO, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent JJF Management Services, Inc. for LFO, Inc..(Regan, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CDOHY, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent JJF Management Services, Inc. for CDOHY, Inc..(Regan, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/25/2021. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR WASHINGTON COUNTY. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Hyundai Motor America, filed by LFO, Inc., CDOHY, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Sheet)(ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hyundai Motor America identifying Corporate Parent Hyundai Motor Company, Other Affiliate Genesis Motor America LLC for Hyundai Motor America.(Marinaccio, Marc) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Washington County, Maryland, case number C-21-CV-21-000181. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9346525), filed by Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Writ of Summons, #4 Exhibit C - Civil Non-Domestic Case Information Report)(Marinaccio, Marc) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENESIS MOTOR AMERICA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan L Ford(Designation Retained)