This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2022 at 08:32:01 (UTC).

Lezinski v. XL Specialty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 Lezinski filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against XL Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert D. Mariani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00267

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert D. Mariani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William M. Lezinski

Defendants

XL Specialty Insurance Company

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christine S. Lezinski

Attorney at Lenahan & Dempsey, P.C.

116 N. Washington Ave., Suite 400 Kane Bldg.

Scranton, PA 18503

Timothy G. Lenahan

Attorney at Lenahan & Dempsey

116 N. Washington Ave., P.O.Box 234

Scranton, PA 18501

Defendant Attorneys

Leland Howard Jones, IV

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP

2050 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Yuri J. Brunetti

1617 Jfk Boulevard, Suite 955

Philadelphia, NJ 19103

David H. Topol

Attorney at WILEY REIN LLP

2050 M Street Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Marie Ysabelle Hope Gatmaitan Reyes

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP

2050 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Harvey D. Mervis, Esq. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 4/22/22. (jam) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#15

(#15) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kimberly M. Kostun on behalf of John D. Nardone, Patricia L. Nardone Attorney Harvey Mervis is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5922067.. (Kostun, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly M. Kostun on behalf of John D. Nardone, Patricia L. Nardone. (Kostun, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Alex E. Rogers on behalf of AHIFO-10, LLC, Ambit Bridge Loan Master Fund I, LLC, Ambit Funding Advisor I, LLC, Ambit Originator I, LLC, Ambit Real Estate Master Fund International, Ltd., Pacifica Lenders, LLC, Pierce Street A, LP, Pierce Street B, LP, Y. Judd Shoval. (Rogers, Alex) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by Indian Harbor Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company.(Jones, Leland) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#11

(#11) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Marie Ysabelle hope Gatmaitan Reyes, Esq. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/30/22. (jam) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#10

(#10) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Marie Ysabelle Hope Gatmaitan Reyes on behalf of Indian Harbor Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company Attorney Marie Ysabelle Hope Reyes is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5895909.. (Reyes, Marie Ysabelle Hope) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#9

(#9) STATUS REPORT of Plaintiff by William M. Lezinski. (Lenahan, Timothy) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by XL Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance America, Inc., Corporate Parent X.L. America, Inc., Corporate Parent XL Financial Holdings (Ireland) Limited, Corporate Parent XL Bermuda Ltd, Corporate Parent EXEL Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent XL Group Ltd, Corporate Parent AXA SA, Corporate Parent XLIT Ltd. for XL Specialty Insurance Company.. (Jones, Leland) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Indian Harbor Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent XL Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance America, Inc., Corporate Parent X.L. America, Inc., Corporate Parent XL Financial Holdings (Ireland) Limited, Corporate Parent XL Bermuda Ltd, Corporate Parent EXEL Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent XLIT Ltd, Corporate Parent XL Group Ltd, Corporate Parent AXA SA for Indian Harbor Insurance Company.. (Jones, Leland) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER approving #5 Stipulation - Indian Harbor Insurance Company /XL Specialty ANSWER DUE 4/1/2022; Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/28/22. (sm) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by Indian Harbor Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company, filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company.(Brunetti, Yuri) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#4

(#4) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Leland Howard Jones IV, Esq. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/25/22. (dw) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/24/22. (ao) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#2

(#2) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Leland Howard Jones, IV on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Leland Jones is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5857977.. (Jones, Leland) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Indian Harbor Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company from Lackawanna County Court of Common Pleas, case number 22-CV-379. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5855667)filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dw) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Harvey D. Mervis, Esq. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 4/22/22. (jam) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kimberly M. Kostun on behalf of John D. Nardone, Patricia L. Nardone Attorney Harvey Mervis is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5922067.. (Kostun, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly M. Kostun on behalf of John D. Nardone, Patricia L. Nardone. (Kostun, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Alex E. Rogers on behalf of AHIFO-10, LLC, Ambit Bridge Loan Master Fund I, LLC, Ambit Funding Advisor I, LLC, Ambit Originator I, LLC, Ambit Real Estate Master Fund International, Ltd., Pacifica Lenders, LLC, Pierce Street A, LP, Pierce Street B, LP, Y. Judd Shoval. (Rogers, Alex) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by Indian Harbor Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company.(Jones, Leland) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Marie Ysabelle hope Gatmaitan Reyes, Esq. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/30/22. (jam) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Marie Ysabelle Hope Gatmaitan Reyes on behalf of Indian Harbor Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company Attorney Marie Ysabelle Hope Reyes is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5895909.. (Reyes, Marie Ysabelle Hope) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATUS REPORT of Plaintiff by William M. Lezinski. (Lenahan, Timothy) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by XL Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance America, Inc., Corporate Parent X.L. America, Inc., Corporate Parent XL Financial Holdings (Ireland) Limited, Corporate Parent XL Bermuda Ltd, Corporate Parent EXEL Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent XL Group Ltd, Corporate Parent AXA SA, Corporate Parent XLIT Ltd. for XL Specialty Insurance Company.. (Jones, Leland) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Indian Harbor Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent XL Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance America, Inc., Corporate Parent X.L. America, Inc., Corporate Parent XL Financial Holdings (Ireland) Limited, Corporate Parent XL Bermuda Ltd, Corporate Parent EXEL Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent XLIT Ltd, Corporate Parent XL Group Ltd, Corporate Parent AXA SA for Indian Harbor Insurance Company.. (Jones, Leland) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER approving #5 Stipulation - Indian Harbor Insurance Company /XL Specialty ANSWER DUE 4/1/2022; Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/28/22. (sm) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by Indian Harbor Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company, filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company.(Brunetti, Yuri) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Leland Howard Jones IV, Esq. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/25/22. (dw) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/24/22. (ao) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Leland Howard Jones, IV on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Leland Jones is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5857977.. (Jones, Leland) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: David H. Topol, Esquire and Leland H. Jones, IV, Esquire are requested to update their contact information in PACER. (dw) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Indian Harbor Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company from Lackawanna County Court of Common Pleas, case number 22-CV-379. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5855667)filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dw) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leland Howard Jones, IV

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YURI J. BRUNETTI