This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/10/2023 at 08:59:26 (UTC).

Lexington Luminance LLC v. Technical Consumer Products, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/12/2022 Lexington Luminance LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Technical Consumer Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David A. Ruiz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-02235

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David A. Ruiz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lexington Luminance LLC

Defendant

Technical Consumer Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert David Katz

Attorney at Katz Law

6060 North Central Expressway

Dallas, TX 75206

Howard L. Wernow

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt & Wernow

1100 Aegis Tower, 4940 Munson Street, Nw

Canton, OH 44718

Defendant Attorney

David B. Cupar

Attorney at McDonald Hopkins - Cleveland

600 Superior Avenue, E

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Technical Consumer Products, Inc.. (Cupar, David) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

9 #12

Exhibit 10 - Prelim Resp IPR2017-1780

9 #11

Exhibit 9 - Menards Complaint

9 #10

Exhibit 8 - Lighting Supplies Complaint

9 #9

Exhibit 7 - NIRC

9 #8

Exhibit 6 - 12/5/201 Reexamination Certificate

9 #7

Exhibit 5 - 05/14/2014 Amendment

9 #6

Exhibit 4 - 04/14/2014 Office Action

9 #5

Exhibit 3 - 12/6/2013 Grant of Reexamination

9 #4

Exhibit 2 - Amendment dated 5/22/2004

9 #3

Exhibit 1 - Office Action dated 3/8/2004

9 #2

Exhibit Declaration of David Cupar

9 #1

Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint for Fa

#9

(#9) Motion to dismiss the complaint for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Technical Consumer Products, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Exhibit Declaration of David Cupar, #3 Exhibit 1 - Office Action dated 3/8/2004, #4 Exhibit 2 - Amendment dated 5/22/2004, #5 Exhibit 3 - 12/6/2013 Grant of Reexamination, #6 Exhibit 4 - 04/14/2014 Office Action, #7 Exhibit 5 - 05/14/2014 Amendment, #8 Exhibit 6 - 12/5/201 Reexamination Certificate, #9 Exhibit 7 - NIRC, #10 Exhibit 8 - Lighting Supplies Complaint, #11 Exhibit 9 - Menards Complaint, #12 Exhibit 10 - Prelim Resp IPR2017-1780)(Cupar, David) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1-US Patent 6936851

#1

(#1) Complaint for patent infringement with jury demand against Technical Consumer Products, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11749386. Filed by Lexington Luminance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-US Patent 6936851, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons). (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Technical Consumer Products, Inc.. (Cupar, David) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion to dismiss the complaint for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Technical Consumer Products, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Exhibit Declaration of David Cupar, #3 Exhibit 1 - Office Action dated 3/8/2004, #4 Exhibit 2 - Amendment dated 5/22/2004, #5 Exhibit 3 - 12/6/2013 Grant of Reexamination, #6 Exhibit 4 - 04/14/2014 Office Action, #7 Exhibit 5 - 05/14/2014 Amendment, #8 Exhibit 6 - 12/5/201 Reexamination Certificate, #9 Exhibit 7 - NIRC, #10 Exhibit 8 - Lighting Supplies Complaint, #11 Exhibit 9 - Menards Complaint, #12 Exhibit 10 - Prelim Resp IPR2017-1780)(Cupar, David) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #8 Motion for extension of time until 02/09/2023 for Defendant to answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant Technical Consumer Products, Inc. answer due 02/09/2023. Judge David A. Ruiz on 1/9/2023. (G,CA) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion for extension of time until 02/09/2023 to answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Lexington Luminance LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #5 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Robert David Katz for Lexington Luminance LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge David A. Ruiz on 12/27/2022. Related document #6 (G,CA) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Technical Consumer Products, Inc. on 12/20/2022, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Lexington Luminance LLC. Related document(s) #4 (B,DL) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Technical Consumer Products, Inc placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified Mail mail. Receipt # 7020 0090 0001 4429 2350. (B,DL) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Supplement for attorney Robert D. Katz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11753014, filed by Plaintiff Lexington Luminance LLC. Related document(s) #5 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration with Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Wernow, Howard) Modified on 12/15/2022 (S,KM). (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion for attorney Robert D. Katz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11753014, filed by Plaintiff Lexington Luminance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration #2 Proposed Order)(Wernow, Howard) Modified on 12/15/2022 (S,KM). (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketThis action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (B,DL) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Technical Consumer Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,DL) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (B,DL) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketJudge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (B,DL) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lexington Luminance LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Lexington Luminance LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint for patent infringement with jury demand against Technical Consumer Products, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11749386. Filed by Lexington Luminance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-US Patent 6936851, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons). (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less