This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2019 at 07:19:06 (UTC).

Lexington Insurance Company v. WireCo Worldgroup Inc et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 Lexington Insurance Company filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against WireCo Worldgroup Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is D. P. Marshall Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00016

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

D. P. Marshall Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lexington Insurance Company

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Jaco Construction Company

WireCo Worldgroup Inc

Yarbrough Cable Services LLC

John Does

Heavy Machines Inc

Morgan Engineering Systems Inc

Casar Drahtseilwerk Saar GMBH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kyle Ray Wilson

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings

200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201-3699

Quinten J. Whiteside

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings

200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201-3699

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Michael J. Emerson

Attorney at Barber Law Firm PLLC

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 3400

Little Rock, AR 72201

Bruce E. Munson

Attorney at Munson, Rowlett, Moore & Boone, P.A.

Regions Center, Suite 1900, 400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201

Richard N. Watts

Attorney at Watts, Donovan & Tilley, P.A.

200 River Market Avenue, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-1769

Robert E. Dodson

Attorney at Dodson & Dodson, L.L.P.

5515 Plaza Drive

Texarkana, TX 75503

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Bruce E. Munson

Attorney at Munson, Rowlett, Moore & Boone, P.A.

Regions Center, Suite 1900, 400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201

Robert E. Dodson

Attorney at Dodson & Dodson, L.L.P.

5515 Plaza Drive

Texarkana, TX 75503

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ADDENDUM filed by WireCo Worldgroup Inc to #10 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,. Supplemental Exhibit (Munson, Bruce) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by WireCo Worldgroup Inc (Munson, Bruce) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #5 Crossclaims of Heavy Machines, Inc. with Jury Demand by WireCo Worldgroup Inc.(Munson, Bruce) (Docket entry modified on 4/15/2019 to establish linkage and correct the description of the document.)(cmn) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against John Does, Heavy Machines Inc, Jaco Construction Company, Morgan Engineering Systems Inc, Yarbrough Cable Services LLC by WireCo Worldgroup Inc.(Munson, Bruce) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE re #8 Answer to Complaint CrossClaim of Yarbrough Cable Services LLC by Jaco Construction Company (Emerson, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Yarbrough Cable Services LLC.(Watts, Richard) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Quinten J. Whiteside on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company (Whiteside, Quinten) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Heavy Machines, Inc. and all Cross-Claims Filed or to be Filed by all Defendants by Jaco Construction Company.(Emerson, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM and Answers to All Cross-Claims against WireCo Worldgroup Inc, Casar Drahtseilwerk Saar GMBH, Yarbrough Cable Services LLC, Jaco Construction Company, Morgan Engineering Systems Inc and John Does filed by Heavy Machines Inc.(Dodson, Robert) (Docket text modified on 4/8/2019 to indicate the Crossclaim is filed against Defendants.) (thd). (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Dodson on behalf of Heavy Machines Inc (Dodson, Robert) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jaco Construction Company.(Emerson, Michael) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Emerson on behalf of Jaco Construction Company (Emerson, Michael) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Lexington Insurance Company. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT070894. summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to establish linkage and correct the description of the document filed as follows, "ANSWER to #5 Crossclaims of Heavy Machines, Inc. with Jury Demand by WireCo Worldgroup Inc."(cmn) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ADDENDUM filed by WireCo Worldgroup Inc to #10 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,. Supplemental Exhibit (Munson, Bruce) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by WireCo Worldgroup Inc (Munson, Bruce) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #5 Crossclaims of Heavy Machines, Inc. with Jury Demand by WireCo Worldgroup Inc.(Munson, Bruce) (Docket entry modified on 4/15/2019 to establish linkage and correct the description of the document.)(cmn) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against John Does, Heavy Machines Inc, Jaco Construction Company, Morgan Engineering Systems Inc, Yarbrough Cable Services LLC by WireCo Worldgroup Inc.(Munson, Bruce) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE re #8 Answer to Complaint CrossClaim of Yarbrough Cable Services LLC by Jaco Construction Company (Emerson, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Yarbrough Cable Services LLC.(Watts, Richard) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Quinten J. Whiteside on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company (Whiteside, Quinten) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the Crossclaim is filed against WireCo Worldgroup Inc, Casar Drahtseilwerk Saar GMBH, Yarbrough Cable Services LLC, Jaco Construction Company, Morgan Engineering Systems Inc and John Does. (thd) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Heavy Machines, Inc. and all Cross-Claims Filed or to be Filed by all Defendants by Jaco Construction Company.(Emerson, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM and Answers to All Cross-Claims against WireCo Worldgroup Inc, Casar Drahtseilwerk Saar GMBH, Yarbrough Cable Services LLC, Jaco Construction Company, Morgan Engineering Systems Inc and John Does filed by Heavy Machines Inc.(Dodson, Robert) (Docket text modified on 4/8/2019 to indicate the Crossclaim is filed against Defendants.) (thd). (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Dodson on behalf of Heavy Machines Inc (Dodson, Robert) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jaco Construction Company.(Emerson, Michael) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Emerson on behalf of Jaco Construction Company (Emerson, Michael) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Lexington Insurance Company. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT070894. summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.