This case was last updated from PACER on 06/19/2020 at 08:39:27 (UTC).

Lexington Insurance Company v. R&Q Reinsurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 Lexington Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against R Q Reinsurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rya W. Zobel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10763

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rya W. Zobel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lexington Insurance Company

Defendant

R&Q Reinsurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rachel J. Eisenhaure

Attorney at White and Williams LLP

Suite 1930, 101 Arch Street

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lexington Insurance Company (Eisenhaure, Rachel) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexington Insurance Company. R&Q Reinsurance Company waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Eisenhaure, Rachel) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to R&Q Reinsurance Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc.,, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company.. (Eisenhaure, Rachel) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Category Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against R&Q Reinsurance Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8203781 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form, #4 Summons)(Eisenhaure, Rachel) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lexington Insurance Company (Eisenhaure, Rachel) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexington Insurance Company. R&Q Reinsurance Company waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Eisenhaure, Rachel) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to R&Q Reinsurance Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc.,, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company.. (Eisenhaure, Rachel) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against R&Q Reinsurance Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8203781 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form, #4 Summons)(Eisenhaure, Rachel) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less