This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2022 at 07:05:53 (UTC).

Lexington Insurance Company v. Martin A. Mueller et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 Lexington Insurance Company filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Martin A Mueller. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lexington Insurance Company

Defendants

Martin A Mueller

Matthew L.M. Fletcher

Kevin K. Washburn

Martin A. Mueller

Alex Skibine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Joseph Doren

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Bradley Joseph Hamburger

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Daniel Rolf Adler

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kenneth Hiromu Oshita

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Matthew Allan Hoffman

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Defendant Attorney

George Forman

Attorney at Forman and Associates

4340 Redwood Highway Suite E352

San Rafael, CA 94903

 

Court Documents

11 #3

Proposed Order

11 #2

Appendix of Certain Authorities

11 #1

Declaration of Matthew A. Hoffman

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Martin A. Mueller.(Attorney George Forman added to party Martin A. Mueller(pty:dft))(Forman, George) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Matthew L.M. Fletcher, Martin A. Mueller, Alex Skibine, Kevin K. Washburn. (et) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lexington Insurance Company, identifying AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc.; AIG Property Casualty Inc.; American International Group, Inc.. (Doren, Richard) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

3 #1

Attachment

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lexington Insurance Company. (Doren, Richard) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit B to the Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A to the Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Defendants' Exercise of Tribal Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Lexington Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 5/6/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew A. Hoffman, #2 Appendix of Certain Authorities, #3 Proposed Order) (Doren, Richard) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Martin A. Mueller.(Attorney George Forman added to party Martin A. Mueller(pty:dft))(Forman, George) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Matthew L.M. Fletcher, Martin A. Mueller, Alex Skibine, Kevin K. Washburn. (et) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lexington Insurance Company, identifying AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc.; AIG Property Casualty Inc.; American International Group, Inc.. (Doren, Richard) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Doren, Richard) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lexington Insurance Company. (Doren, Richard) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32570441 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to the Complaint) (Attorney Richard Joseph Doren added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Doren, Richard) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George Forman