This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2021 at 08:50:27 (UTC).

Lexington Insurance Company (Boston) MA) v. Sparta Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 Lexington Insurance Company Boston MA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Sparta Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Analisa Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10884

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Analisa Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lexington Insurance Company (Boston) MA)

Lexington Insurance Company

Defendant

Sparta Insurance Company

5 Batterson Park Road

Farmington, CT 06032

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Michael Skelly

Attorney at Marks, O'Neill, O'Brien & Courtney, P.C.

530 Saw Mill River Road

Elmsford, NY 10523

Defendant Attorney

John David McKenna

Attorney at L'Abbate Balkin Colavita & Contini, LLP

1001 Franklin Avenue

Garden City, NY 11530

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file case management order addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James M. Skelly dated February 19, 2021. Document filed by Lexington Insurance Company..(Skelly, James) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: On January 5, 2021, the Court ordered the parties to submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan by February 16, 2021. ECF No. 4, paragraph 4-5. That submission is now overdue. Accordingly, the parties shall submit their joint letter and proposed case management plan by 12:00 p.m. on February 22, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/18/2021) (kv) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #3 Complaint. Document filed by Sparta Insurance Company..(McKenna, John) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Catalina Alpha Ltd., Corporate Parent Alea Holdings US Company, Corporate Parent FIN LLC, Corporate Parent Alea Group Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd. for Sparta Insurance Company. Document filed by Sparta Insurance Company..(McKenna, John) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Complaint. GRANTED. By February 15, 2021, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Sparta Insurance Company answer due 2/15/2021 (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/20/2021) (kv) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint Letter to be So Ordered addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John D. McKenna dated January 19, 2021. Document filed by Sparta Insurance Company..(McKenna, John) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Sparta Insurance Company served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021. Service was accepted by Tracy Price, Chief Financial Officer. Document filed by Lexington Insurance Company..(Skelly, James) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/5/2021) (kv) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/5/2021) (kv) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/23/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres, to be held telephonically. The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/5/2021) (ks) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Sparta Insurance Company. Document filed by Lexington Insurance Company..(Skelly, James) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney James Michael Skelly to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Skelly, James) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney James Michael Skelly. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James Michael Skelly. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lexington Insurance Company (Boston) MA). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Lexington Insurance Company (Boston) MA). (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23177240)Document filed by Lexington Insurance Company (Boston) MA)..(Skelly, James) Modified on 12/30/2020 (dnh). (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPARTA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Michael Skelly