This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2020 at 08:04:52 (UTC).

Lewis v. Wynn Logistics Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Lewis filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Wynn Logistics Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tom S. Lee and Robert H. Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00028

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tom S. Lee

Referral Judge

Robert H. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mahogany Lewis

Defendants

Saab Ghonwa

John Does 1-5

Wynn Logistics Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Ashley Ogden

Attorney at OGDEN & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

500 East Capitol Street, Suite 3

Jackson, MS 39201

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa A. Reppeto

Attorney at JONES WALKER, LLP - Jackson

190 East Capitol St., Suite 800 (39201), P. O. Box 427

Jackson, MS 39205-0427

Amber Lynn Kipfmiller

Attorney at JONES WALKER, LLP - Jackson

190 East Capitol St., Suite 800 (39201), P. O. Box 427

Jackson, MS 39205-0427

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling Telephone Conference set for 2/27/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Answer to Complaint filed by Saab Ghonwa and Wynn Logistics Inc. The Court will notice a Telephonic Case Management Conference. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 2/27/2020 (SR) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint Corrected by Saab Ghonwa, Wynn Logistics Inc..(Reppeto, Lisa) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7 : Pursuant to the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Section 2.C. and FED.R.Civ.P.11 an attorney's password issued by the court combined with the user's identification (login) serves as the attorney's signature for Rule 11 and other purposes. Attorneys should not permit other attorneys to use their login and password for any ECF filing. Document #7 will be disregarded and the attorney with the electronic signature on the document should re-file document. Also, all filing parties should be selected when refiling. (PKM) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 2/27/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Plaintiff will place the telephone call to Judge Walker's chambers with all necessary counsel on the line. (SR) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **ERROR** Disregard this entry. ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wynn Logistics Inc..(Kipfmiller, Amber) Modified on 2/24/2020 (PKM). (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mahogany Lewis. Wynn Logistics Inc. served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Ogden, James) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from Wynn Logistics Inc., re: #3 Summons. (PG) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Mahogany Lewis (Ogden, James) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Wynn Logistics Inc. c/o Karolis Gricius, agent for service of process. (ND) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Saab Ghonwa and to Wynn Logistics Inc. c/o Wynn Harrison, agent for service of process. (MGB) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against John Does 1-5, Saab Ghonwa, Wynn Logistics Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643057992), filed by Mahogany Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Ashley Ogden