This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:18:26 (UTC).

LEWIS v. WARDEN et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by LEWIS against WARDEN in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-17275

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Robert B. Kugler

 

Party Details

Defendants

HEAD OF MEDICAL

M. FISHER

DAVID J. STEEL

DR. TURNER

CASE MANAGER RELSEN

FORMER CAMP ADMINISTRATOR

UNIT MANAGER GILYARD

WARDEN

DR. STOOD

UNIT MANAGER BRYD

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #4

Certificate of Service, Newark

1 #3

Certificate of Service, Trenton

#1

(#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service, Trenton, #4 Certificate of Service, Newark, #5 Application IFP, #6 Envelope)(ssp, ) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

1 #5

Application IFP

1 #6

Envelope

#4

(#4) Letter from KENNETH WAYNE LEWIS. (dmr) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER administratively terminating this case. ORDERED that if Petitioner wishes to reopen this case he shall so notify the Court within 30 days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall supply petitioner with a blank IFP Application etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 9/26/2019. (cry, notice & IFP mailed) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#2

(#2) Responsive Pleading from KENNETH WAYNE LEWIS. (ssp, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from KENNETH WAYNE LEWIS. (dmr) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • ***Civil Case Terminated. (cry, ) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER administratively terminating this case. ORDERED that if Petitioner wishes to reopen this case he shall so notify the Court within 30 days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall supply petitioner with a blank IFP Application etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 9/26/2019. (cry, notice & IFP mailed) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Responsive Pleading from KENNETH WAYNE LEWIS. (ssp, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service, Trenton, #4 Certificate of Service, Newark, #5 Application IFP, #6 Envelope)(ssp, ) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.