This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/24/2021 at 07:03:46 (UTC).

LEWIS v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 LEWIS filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leigh Martin May. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04838

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHELLE LEWIS

Defendants

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc

TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.

Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. A Division Of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, Inc.

TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.

Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc

The Cooper Companies Inc

Coopersurgical Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Randi Kassan

Attorney at Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman

100 Garden City Plazasuite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorney

BRIAN RUBENSTEIN

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP

2700 Two Commerce Square2001 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH LLC f/k/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15456550), filed by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH LLC f/k/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH LLC f/k/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH LLC f/k/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#10

(#10) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 39): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Georgia for the reasons stated in the order of December 16, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Leigh Martin May. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#11

(#11) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-04382. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/23/2021)

11 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-04382. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 39): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Georgia for the reasons stated in the order of December 16, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Leigh Martin May. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docket(#9) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH LLC f/k/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH LLC f/k/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH LLC f/k/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15456550), filed by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH LLC f/k/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/23/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Cooper Companies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Coopersurgical, Inc. is a litigant