This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2019 at 08:03:32 (UTC).

Lewis v. Surge Staffing, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 Lewis filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Surge Staffing, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gray M. Borden and Myron H. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00048

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gray M. Borden

Presiding Judge

Myron H. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Megan-Rhea Lewis

Defendants

Surgeforce, LLC

Surge Staffing, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ashley Nicole Smith

Attorney at Miller Smith, LLC

445 Dexter Avenue; Suite 4050

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Wade White

Attorney at Adams White Oliver Short & Forbus, LLP

Po Box 2069

Opelika, AL 36803-2069

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: An on-the-record Pretrial Conference is set for 7/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Jury Trial set for 8/24/2020 trial term at 10:00 AM in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2019. Discovery due by 12/20/2019. Motions due by 1/17/2020. Mediation Notice due by 12/27/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/1/2019. Furnished calendar, AG. (dmn, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Smith, Ashley) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#9

(#9) RULE 26(f) ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/1/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/8/2019. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Surge Staffing, LLC. (White, Matthew) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/8/2019) (dmn, ) Modified on 2/8/2019 to replace pdf with properly formatted pdf only, no text modified. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Surgeforce, LLC. (White, Matthew) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/8/2019) (dmn, ). Modified on 2/8/2019 to replace pdf with properly formatted pdf only, no text modified. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Surge Staffing, LLC, Surgeforce, LLC.(White, Matthew) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#5

(#5) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Daniel D. Kelley for Surgeforce, LLC served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#4

(#4) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Laura McHaney for Surge Staffing, LLC served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Surge Staffing, LLC, and Surgeforce, LLC. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Megan-Rhea Lewis. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

1 #4

Filing Fee Receipt

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B, EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights

1 #1

Exhibit A, EEOC Charge of Discrimination (redacted)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Surge Staffing, LLC, Surgeforce, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602052069.), filed by Megan-Rhea Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, EEOC Charge of Discrimination (redacted), #2 Exhibit B, EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, ) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: An on-the-record Pretrial Conference is set for 7/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Jury Trial set for 8/24/2020 trial term at 10:00 AM in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2019. Discovery due by 12/20/2019. Motions due by 1/17/2020. Mediation Notice due by 12/27/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/1/2019. Furnished calendar, AG. (dmn, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Smith, Ashley) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RULE 26(f) ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/1/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/8/2019. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Surge Staffing, LLC. (White, Matthew) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/8/2019) (dmn, ) Modified on 2/8/2019 to replace pdf with properly formatted pdf only, no text modified. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Surgeforce, LLC. (White, Matthew) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/8/2019) (dmn, ). Modified on 2/8/2019 to replace pdf with properly formatted pdf only, no text modified. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Surge Staffing, LLC, Surgeforce, LLC.(White, Matthew) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Daniel D. Kelley for Surgeforce, LLC served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Laura McHaney for Surge Staffing, LLC served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Surge Staffing, LLC, and Surgeforce, LLC. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Megan-Rhea Lewis. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Megan-Rhea Lewis. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #1 for pdf.) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Surge Staffing, LLC, Surgeforce, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602052069.), filed by Megan-Rhea Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, EEOC Charge of Discrimination (redacted), #2 Exhibit B, EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, ) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less