This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2019 at 07:59:14 (UTC).

Lewis v. Davis

Case Summary

On 07/30/2019 Lewis filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Davis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sam R Cummings and James Wesley Hendrix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00165

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sam R Cummings

James Wesley Hendrix

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Darren Glenn Lewis

Amarillo, TX 79107

Respondents

Kendall T Richerson

Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Patrick Daniel Todd

Attorney at Office of Attorney General

300 West 15Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (rekc) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#3

(#3) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Darren Glenn Lewis. (Filing fee $5; receipt number 117881) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (rekc) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#4

(#4) Order transferring case to the Abilene Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/1/2019) (rekc) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jak) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

(#19) Motion to Allow Additional Pre-Trial Motions filed by Darren Glenn Lewis. (jak) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#18

(#18) Motion to Suppress Evidence Under Art. 38.071 and Motion for Hearing filed by Darren Glenn Lewis. (**Clerk's note: motion for hearing referenced in prayer of document.) (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Declaration) (jak) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

18 #1

*Restricted*

17 #1

*Restricted*

#17

(#17) Administrative Record consisting of State court papers filed by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Attachments: #1 01 Pro-Se Notice of Appeal, #2 02 Pro Se Doc 7.26.18, #3 03 Pro Se Doc 8.1.18, #4 04 Pro Se Doc 8.6.18, #5 05 Pro Se Doc 8.10.18, #6 06 Pro Se Doc 8.15.18, #7 07 Trial Court's Certification of Defendant's Right of Appeal, #8 08 Written Plea Admonishments, #9 09 Judgment and Sentence, #10 10 MEM OPINION ISSD - 1118186CR-Lewis, #11 11 MEM OPINION ISSD - j18186CR-Lewis, #12 12 MEM OPINION ISSD (CR)_FILECOPY, #13 13 Opinion, #14 14 Stipulation of Evidence, #15 15 PD-0361-19 EXT PDR, #16 16 PD-0361-19 EXT PDR DENIAL, #17 17 WR-88,859-01 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 9-19-2018, #18 18 WR-88,859-01 ADDRESS CHANGE 10-24-2018, #19 19 WR-88,859-01 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 8-17-2018, #20 20 WR-88,859-02 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 11-7-2018, #21 21 WR-88,859-02 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 10-15-2018) (Todd, Patrick) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

17 #21

21 WR-88,859-02 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 10-15-2018

17 #20

20 WR-88,859-02 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 11-7-2018

17 #15

*Restricted*

17 #14

14 Stipulation of Evidence

17 #13

13 Opinion

17 #12

12 MEM OPINION ISSD (CR)_FILECOPY

17 #19

19 WR-88,859-01 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 8-17-2018

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) (Document Restricted) Unsworn Declaration filed by Darren Glenn Lewis. (jak) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Motion to Allow Additional Pre-Trial Motions filed by Darren Glenn Lewis. (jak) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Motion to Suppress Evidence Under Art. 38.071 and Motion for Hearing filed by Darren Glenn Lewis. (**Clerk's note: motion for hearing referenced in prayer of document.) (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Declaration) (jak) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Administrative Record consisting of State court papers filed by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Attachments: #1 01 Pro-Se Notice of Appeal, #2 02 Pro Se Doc 7.26.18, #3 03 Pro Se Doc 8.1.18, #4 04 Pro Se Doc 8.6.18, #5 05 Pro Se Doc 8.10.18, #6 06 Pro Se Doc 8.15.18, #7 07 Trial Court's Certification of Defendant's Right of Appeal, #8 08 Written Plea Admonishments, #9 09 Judgment and Sentence, #10 10 MEM OPINION ISSD - 1118186CR-Lewis, #11 11 MEM OPINION ISSD - j18186CR-Lewis, #12 12 MEM OPINION ISSD (CR)_FILECOPY, #13 13 Opinion, #14 14 Stipulation of Evidence, #15 15 PD-0361-19 EXT PDR, #16 16 PD-0361-19 EXT PDR DENIAL, #17 17 WR-88,859-01 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 9-19-2018, #18 18 WR-88,859-01 ADDRESS CHANGE 10-24-2018, #19 19 WR-88,859-01 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 8-17-2018, #20 20 WR-88,859-02 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 11-7-2018, #21 21 WR-88,859-02 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 10-15-2018) (Todd, Patrick) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE filed by Darren Glenn Lewis. (jak) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Motion for Exculpatory and Mitigating Evidence filed by Darren Glenn Lewis. (jak) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Todd, Patrick) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Daniel Todd on behalf of Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Todd, Patrick) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Tue Aug 27 13:24:47 CDT 2019 (crt) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER. Petitioner filed an "Order Appointing Counsel for the Appeal" #11 . The motion is denied. If a court determines that an evidentiary hearing is necessary to resolve the habeas petition, the court must appoint counsel. But "until the judge decides to hold a hearing, he has discretion over whether to appoint counsel." At this time, no hearing has been scheduled. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/27/2019) (jmc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4, 6. Fri Aug 2 13:10:25 CDT 2019 (crt) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jak) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • (#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) (jak) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Aug 2 11:46:57 CDT 2019 (crt) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • New case number 1:19-cv-00165-C Lewis v. Richerson has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 3:19cv1812-G. Future filings should be made in the ABILENE division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ldm) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order transferring case to the Abilene Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/1/2019) (rekc) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Wed Jul 31 10:44:00 CDT 2019 (crt) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Darren Glenn Lewis. (Filing fee $5; receipt number 117881) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (rekc) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (rekc) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.