This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/09/2022 at 08:21:50 (UTC).

Lewis v. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 Lewis filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David L. Bunning and P SO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00025

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Bunning

Referral Judge

P SO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Thomas Lewis

New Castle, KY 40050

Defendants

Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency

Educational Credit Management Corporation Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

J. Robert Linneman

Attorney at Santen & Hughes

600 Vine Street, Suite 2700

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Bryan J. Sisto

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, Suite 3200

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Memorandum in Support

1 #3

Exhibit

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Summons Educational Credit Management Corporation Group, Inc.

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Sample Caption

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2016.(JJ)cc: COR and Michael Thomas Lewis by US Mail (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#6

(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #4 , #5 sent to Michael Thomas Lewis, 616 Fallen Timber Rd, New Castle, Ky 40050. (CBD) Modified text on 5/23/2022 (CBD). (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Thomas Lewis. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (CBD) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned (date of service not entered on form) by Educational Credit Management Corporation Group, Inc. (CBD) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned (date of service not entered on form) by Educational Credit Management Corporation Group, Inc. (CBD) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Thomas Lewis. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (CBD) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketAttorney Update. Attorney Bryan J. Sisto for Educational Credit Management Corporation Group, Inc.,J. Robert Linneman for Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency added. (CBD) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Note: #4 , #5 re-mailed this date to Michael Thomas Lewis, 611 Fallen Timber Rd, New Castle KY 40050, the address listed on the #3 Summons Issued. (CBD) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #4 , #5 sent to Michael Thomas Lewis, 616 Fallen Timber Rd, New Castle, Ky 40050. (CBD) Modified text on 5/23/2022 (CBD). (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2016.(JJ)cc: COR and Michael Thomas Lewis by US Mail (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JJ) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketConflict Check run. (JJ) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Educational Credit Management Corporation Group, Inc., Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency; Summons issued and returned to pro se plaintiff via pick-up from Office of Clerk (Attachments: #1 Summons Educational Credit Management Corporation Group, Inc.)(JJ) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 3002807), filed by Michael Thomas Lewis, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit)(JJ) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Education Credit Management Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jerome Robert Linneman