This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/17/2022 at 06:33:49 (UTC).

Lewis v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 Lewis filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-03798

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amadi Lewis

Defendant

Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Zev Abramson

Attorney at ABRAMSON LABOR GROUP

3580 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1260

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Baruch Yosef Kreiman

Attorney at Abramson Labor Group

11846 Ventura Boulevard, Ste. 100

Studio City, CA 91604

Nissim M. Levin

Attorney at Abramson Labor Group

3580 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1260

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

Sean T. Strauss

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street, Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Amadi Lewis' First Amended Complaint ) filed byAmadi Lewis. (Kreiman, Baruch Yosef) (Filed on 8/16/2022) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

14 #4

Proposed Order

14 #3

Exhibit A to Declaration of Paula S. Dickson

14 #2

Declaration of Paula Dickson in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pl

14 #1

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Amadi Lew

14 #14

Main Document

#12

(#12) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals RE JULY 20, 2022 OSC WHY MOTION TO DISMISS IS NOT MOOT. (Strauss, Sean) (Filed on 7/21/2022) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#10

(#10) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Filed byAmadi Lewis. (Kreiman, Baruch Yosef) (Filed on 7/19/2022) Modified on 7/20/2022 (msr, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/19/2022)

9 #4

Proposed Order

9 #3

Exhibit A to Declaration of Paula S. Dickson

9 #2

Declaration of Paula S. Dickson in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss

9 #1

Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss

9 #9

Main Document

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2022 at 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Strauss, Sean) (Filed on 6/28/2022) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 06/28/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#4

(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022) Modified on 6/28/2022 (wft, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#3

(#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals.. (Strauss, Sean) (Filed on 6/28/2022) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Amadi Lewis' First Amended Complaint ) filed byAmadi Lewis. (Kreiman, Baruch Yosef) (Filed on 8/16/2022) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Amadi Lewis' First Amended Complaint filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 8/16/2022. Replies due by 8/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Amadi Lewis' First Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration of Paula Dickson in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Amadi Lewis' First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Paula S. Dickson, #4 Proposed Order)(Strauss, Sean) (Filed on 8/2/2022) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. FINDING AS MOOT Dkt. No. #9 Defendant's motion to dismiss in light of Dkt. No. #10 Plaintiff's amended complaint. Any future motion to dismiss should be noticed in accordance with the Court's Scheduling Notes, which include procedures for requesting a limited availability date or advancing a hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2022) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals RE JULY 20, 2022 OSC WHY MOTION TO DISMISS IS NOT MOOT. (Strauss, Sean) (Filed on 7/21/2022) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketSet Deadline, See Docket No. 11 : Show Cause Response due by 7/27/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING Defendant TO SHOW CAUSE why Dkt. No. #9 Defendant's motion to dismiss is not moot in light of Dkt. No. #10 Plaintiff's amended complaint. Defendant shall file a statement of two pages or less by July 27, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Filed byAmadi Lewis. (Kreiman, Baruch Yosef) (Filed on 7/19/2022) Modified on 7/20/2022 (msr, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Amadi Lewis' Complaint filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 7/19/2022. Replies due by 7/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Paula S. Dickson in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Paula S. Dickson, #4 Proposed Order)(Strauss, Sean) (Filed on 7/5/2022) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. #7 . Notice is hereby given that the initial case management conference, set for September 27, 2022 will be held telephonically on that date before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. The September 27th proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2022) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2022 at 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Strauss, Sean) (Filed on 6/28/2022) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 06/28/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022) Modified on 6/28/2022 (wft, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals.. (Strauss, Sean) (Filed on 6/28/2022) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/12/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is 22CV011759. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17300008). Filed byKaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean T. Strauss in Support of Kaiser Foundation Hospitals' Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Sean T. Strauss, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Sean T. Strauss, #4 Declaration of Paula S. Dickson in Support of Kaiser Foundation Hospitals' Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Paula S. Dickson, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Strauss, Sean) (Filed on 6/27/2022) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean T Strauss