This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 12:02:58 (UTC).

Lewis v. Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Lewis filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Bloom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-21420

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dale Lewis

Defendants

Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc.

Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC

Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph R Johnson

Attorney at Babbitt & Johnson, P.A.

1641 Worthington Road, Suite 100

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

Kolter C. McKenzie

Attorney at Martin Baughman, PLLC

3141 Hood Street, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT The Motion, ECF No. #10 , isDENIED. This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER Denying #6 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER The above-styled case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is permitted to file an amended complaint that properly alleges the basis for invoking diversity jurisdiction on or before April 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) Modified on 4/16/2021 - Document Type correction re: Opinion. (jmd) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc.. (jbs) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT The Motion, ECF No. #10 , isDENIED. This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Order Dismissing Case,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #8 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint ( Responses due by 5/20/2021), Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Dale Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Attachment 1 to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Attachment 2 to Amended Complaint, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Joseph) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Kolter C. McKenzie. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Denying #6 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kolter C. McKenzie. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14644191 by Dale Lewis. Responses due by 5/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint ( Responses due by 5/11/2021), Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Dale Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Attachment to Amended Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER The above-styled case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is permitted to file an amended complaint that properly alleges the basis for invoking diversity jurisdiction on or before April 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) Modified on 4/16/2021 - Document Type correction re: Opinion. (jmd) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc.. (jbs) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14604570, filed by Dale Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Johnson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kolter C McKenzie

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Robert Johnson