This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 10:40:00 (UTC).

Lewis v. Burger King Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Lewis filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Burger King Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allen Lewis

Defendant

Burger King Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Luke Vincent

Attorney at Martin & Vincent

431 Sixteenth Street, P.O. Box 2528

Ashland, KY 41105-2528

Andrew Kenneth Wheeler

Attorney at Martin & Vincent

431 Sixteenth Street, P.O. Box 2528

Ashland, KY 41105-2528

Defendant Attorneys

Brian Michael Gudalis

Attorney at Ward, Hocker & Thornton - Lexington

333 W. Vine Street, Suite 1100

Lexington, KY 40507

James P. Freel

Attorney at Ward, Hocker & Thornton, PLLC - Lexington

333 W. Vine Street, Suite 1100

Lexington, KY 40507

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) NLT 11/30/20 file motions to amend and join parties; 2) NLT 1/2/21 pla disclose experts; 2A) NLT 2/2/21 deft disclose expert; 3) NLT 30 days thereafter parties disclose rebuttal experts; 4) NLT 5/1/21 complete discovery; 5) NLT 6/30/21 file dispositive motions; 6) FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 9/20/2021 at 01:30 PM in ASHLAND before Judge Henry R. Wilhoit Jr.; 7) NLT 7 days prior to PTC, counsel file witness list, list of exhibits, pretrial memorandum (8) NLT 7 days prior to PTC, counsel submit to Chambers copy of each documentary exhibit (9) NLT 7 days prior to PTC, counsel formulate Agreed proposed jury instructions (10) At time of PTC counsel to file agreed proposed jury instructions (11) At time of PTC, counsel shall file any objections to use of depos or admissibility of exhibits. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 10/14/20.(JLS)cc: COR (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#7

(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Freel, James) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#6

(#6) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Burger King Corporation. (Freel, James) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER: (1) NLT 9/9/20 counsel for parties shall CONDUCT meeting as required (2) At time of meeting, counsel for parties shall EXCHANGE disclosures required (3) NLT 9/21/20 counsel for parties to FILE a written joint report of the meeting. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/19/20.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the removal of this action shall be sustained. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/19/20.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, James P. Freel. #1 Notice of Removal has been filed by Burger King Corporation without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLS) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #1

State Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boyd Circuit Court, Division I, case number 20-CI-129. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4751716), filed by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(JLS) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) NLT 11/30/20 file motions to amend and join parties; 2) NLT 1/2/21 pla disclose experts; 2A) NLT 2/2/21 deft disclose expert; 3) NLT 30 days thereafter parties disclose rebuttal experts; 4) NLT 5/1/21 complete discovery; 5) NLT 6/30/21 file dispositive motions; 6) FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 9/20/2021 at 01:30 PM in ASHLAND before Judge Henry R. Wilhoit Jr.; 7) NLT 7 days prior to PTC, counsel file witness list, list of exhibits, pretrial memorandum (8) NLT 7 days prior to PTC, counsel submit to Chambers copy of each documentary exhibit (9) NLT 7 days prior to PTC, counsel formulate Agreed proposed jury instructions (10) At time of PTC counsel to file agreed proposed jury instructions (11) At time of PTC, counsel shall file any objections to use of depos or admissibility of exhibits. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 10/14/20.(JLS)cc: COR (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Freel, James) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Burger King Corporation. (Freel, James) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: (1) NLT 9/9/20 counsel for parties shall CONDUCT meeting as required (2) At time of meeting, counsel for parties shall EXCHANGE disclosures required (3) NLT 9/21/20 counsel for parties to FILE a written joint report of the meeting. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/19/20.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the removal of this action shall be sustained. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/19/20.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for jurisdictional review: #1 Notice of Removal. (JLS) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, James P. Freel. #1 Notice of Removal has been filed by Burger King Corporation without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLS) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Burger King Corporation, contained as part of the State Court Record in DE #1 at Exhibit 1.(JLS) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (JLS) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boyd Circuit Court, Division I, case number 20-CI-129. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4751716), filed by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(JLS) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less